This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2018 at 08:03:36 (UTC).

Fissette, Gregory v. Dzuranda, James et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 Fissette, Gregory filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dzuranda, James. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00609

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory Arthur Fissette

La Crosse, WI 54601-3296

Defendants

James Dzuranda

Joseph Haggan

Eric Ellison

Not Classified By Court

DCI Prison Facility

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 9.13 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/9/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER that plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette's request for a stay of the collection of the $9.13 initial partial payment, dkt. #5 , is DENIED. Plaintiff may have an extension of time until 9/17/2018 to submit the $9.13 initial partial payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

#9

(#9) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

10 #1

Documents re exhaustion of state remedies

1 #1

La Crosse County Court motion and order

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) Letter from Plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette re: his inability to pay $9.13 initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Arthur Fissette. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 La Crosse County Court motion and order, #2 Envelope) (jef) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

8 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#10

(#10) Letter from Gregory Arthur Fissette enclosing supplemental documents to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Documents re exhaustion of state remedies) (nln),(ps) (Attachment 1 replaced with version with redacted DOB on 9/27/2018) (nln). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Letter from Gregory Arthur Fissette enclosing supplemental documents to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Documents re exhaustion of state remedies) (nln),(ps) (Attachment 1 replaced with version with redacted DOB on 9/27/2018) (nln). (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 9.13, receipt number 34690032814. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail sent to Gregory Arthur Fissette at the La Crosse County Jail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Order. Mail re-sent to Plaintiff at Dodge Correctional Institution per verification on DOC inmate locator. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette's request for a stay of the collection of the $9.13 initial partial payment, dkt. #5 , is DENIED. Plaintiff may have an extension of time until 9/17/2018 to submit the $9.13 initial partial payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2018. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette re: his inability to pay $9.13 initial partial payment. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 9.13 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 8/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/9/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette. (jef),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gregory Arthur Fissette. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Arthur Fissette. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 La Crosse County Court motion and order, #2 Envelope) (jef) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.