This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2018 at 07:51:29 (UTC).

Fishinghawk v. Bender et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Fishinghawk filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bender. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James H. Payne and Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James H. Payne

Referral Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evan Fishinghawk

Lexington, OK 73051-0548

Defendants

Lee LNU

Stephony Bender

Bird LNU

John Lee

Travis Bird

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.19 which is due by 11/13/2018. (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#6

(#6) LETTER from OKED to Plaintiff re: 285 forms(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Evan Fishinghawk (acg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Evan Fishinghawk Responses due by 11/5/2018(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Stephony Bender (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Travis Bird (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Lee (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Lee (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Stephony Bender (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Travis Bird (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder, directing the Clerk of Court to issue Civil Summons for the named defendants and to forward the issued Summons to the U.S. Marshal for service. The plaintiff has been granted In Forma Pauperis status. (Re: #1 Complaint ) (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • PARTIAL FILING FEES Paid on 11/16/2018 in the amount of $1.19, receipt number 16028 by Evan Fishinghawk (nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER from OKED to Plaintiff re: 285 forms(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne : Granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $1.19 which is due by 11/13/2018. (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Evan Fishinghawk Responses due by 11/5/2018(acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: Upon review of the file in this case, the Court finds that the plaintiff has not submitted a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or paid the $350.00 filing fee and the $50.00 administrative fee. The plaintiff is directed to submit a properly executed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with original signature and have the Trust Fund Officer at his facility complete (with an original signature) the Required Certification of Statement of Institutional Accounts and provide a current 6-month financial accounting statement and return the completed motion to the Office of the Clerk, or pay the filing and administrative fees totaling $400.00 within 20 days or by 10/26/18. If the plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status, he will not be required to pay the $50.00 administrative fee. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis form and an instruction sheet. (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • (#2) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge James H. Payne, referring case to Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-18-332-JHP-SPS. (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Evan Fishinghawk (acg, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/9/2018 to add filer (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.