This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2020 at 22:40:09 (UTC).

First International Bank & Trust v. Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/03/2018 First International Bank Trust filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel L. Hovland and Clare R. Hochhalter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel L. Hovland

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

First International Bank & Trust

Defendant

Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua A. Swanson

David T. Hermanson

Drew James Hushka

Defendant Attorneys

John W. Morrison, Jr.

Benjamin J. Sand

Paul Jonathan Forster

 

Court Documents

#79

#77

#76

75 #3

Exhibit 11 - 2019 Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey Report dated 7/26/19

75 #2

Exhibit 10 - Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey dated 11/2/17

75 #1

Exhibit 9 - Expert Disclosures of Oasis Petroleum North America LLC

#75

#74

#66

1 #34

Exhibit GG - Affidavit of Service - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint, N

1 #33

Exhibit FF - Ex. A - Notice of Removal

1 #32

Exhibit EE - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #11

Exhibit J - Exhibit 8 - Photo

1 #10

Exhibit I - Exhibit 7 - Photo

1 #4

Exhibit C - Exhibit 1 - Industrial Commission of North Dakota Oil and Gas Divisi

1 #3

Exhibit B - Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

148 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56 filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56. Replies due by 5/6/2020. (am) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) (Text Only) ORDER adopting #77 Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Defendant's reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damage Claim is due by 5/06/2020. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) STIPULATION to Extend Deadline by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) RESPONSE to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) or Rule 56 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Exemplary Damages Claim Under Rule 12(B)(6) or Rule 56 filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) AFFIDAVIT of Attorney Paul Forster in Support of re #74 Reply to Response to Motion by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Expert Disclosures of Oasis Petroleum North America LLC, #2 Exhibit 10 - Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey dated 11/2/17, #3 Exhibit 11 - 2019 Helling Trust 11-15H Tree Survey Report dated 7/26/19)(Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) (Text Only) ORDER by Judge Daniel L. Hovland granting #71 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant's reply brief in support of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiff's Vegetation Impact Assessment and Witness Mark Anderson shall not exceed 12 pages. Defendant's reply brief in support of its Motion in Limine to Partially Exclude Plaintiff's Appraisal Report and Witness Rose Hoefs shall not exceed 9 pages. (CM) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by First International Bank & Trust. (Swanson, Joshua) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's request for treble damages by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum LLC, Other Affiliate Oasis Petroleum Inc. for Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC.. (Forster, Paul) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Docket(#6) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles S. Miller, Jr no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (rh) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by First International Bank & Trust. (cjs) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to First International Bank & Trust. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/17/2018. (cd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/17/2018. (cd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC from Mountrail County, case number not assigned. Filing fee $400, receipt number 118000819, filed by Oasis Petroleum North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Exhibit 1 - Industrial Commission of North Dakota Oil and Gas Division Spill-Incident Report, #5 Exhibit D - Exhibit 2 - Photo, #6 Exhibit E - Exhibit 3 - Photo, #7 Exhibit F - Exhibit 4 - Photo, #8 Exhibit G - Exhibit 5 - Photo, #9 Exhibit H - Exhibit 6 - Photo, #10 Exhibit I - Exhibit 7 - Photo, #11 Exhibit J - Exhibit 8 - Photo, #12 Exhibit K - Exhibit 9 - Photo, #13 Exhibit L - Exhibit 10 - Photo, #14 Exhibit M - Exhibit 11 - Oilfield Environmental Incident Summary, #15 Exhibit N - Exhibit 12 - Sundry Notices and Reports on Wells-Form 4, #16 Exhibit O - Exhibit 13 - Industrial Commission Complaint, #17 Exhibit P - Exhibit 14 - Consent Agreement, #18 Exhibit Q - Exhibit 15 - Photo, #19 Exhibit R - Exhibit 16 - Photo, #20 Exhibit S - Exhibit 17 - Photo, #21 Exhibit T - Exhibit 18 - Photo, #22 Exhibit U - Exhibit 19 - Photo, #23 Exhibit V - Exhibit 20 - Photo, #24 Exhibit W - Exhibit 21 - Photo, #25 Exhibit X - Exhibit 22 - Photo, #26 Exhibit Y - Exhibit 23 - Photo, #27 Exhibit Z - Exhibit 24 - Photo, #28 Exhibit AA - Exhibit 25 - Soil Boring and Monitoring Well Location Map, #29 Exhibit Affidavit of Daniel W. Branham, #30 Exhibit CC - Affidavit of Service - Summons and Complaint, #31 Exhibit DD - Notice of Filing Summons and Complaint, #32 Exhibit EE - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #33 Exhibit FF - Ex. A - Notice of Removal, #34 Exhibit GG - Affidavit of Service - Notice of Filing of Summons and Complaint, Notice of Removal)(cd) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less