This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2021 at 06:54:46 (UTC).

First Charter Financial Corporation v. Pandey Hotel Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 First Charter Financial Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Pandey Hotel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Diane J Humetewa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-02361

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Diane J Humetewa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

First Charter Financial Corporation

Cross Defendants, Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Claimants

Pandey Hotel Corporation

First American Title Insurance Company

Cross Claimant, Defendant and Counter Claimant

First American Title Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendant

Victor Weintraub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

3Rd Party Defendant, Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Franklin Thomas Hovore

Attorney at Hovore Law PLLC

14300 N Northsight Blvd., Ste. 121

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Helen Rubenstein Holden

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2415 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016-4251

Steven Ray Beeghley

Attorney at Sacks Tierney PA

4250 N Drinkwater Blvd., 4Th Fl.

Scottsdale, AZ 85251-3647

John Christopher Shorb

Attorney at Manolio & Firestone PLC

8686 E San Alberto Dr., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Merrick Brian Firestone

Attorney at Manolio & Firestone PLC

8686 E San Alberto Dr., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Cross Defendant, Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Claimant Attorneys

David Edward Shein

Attorney at Shein Phanse Adkins PC

6720 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 261

Scottsdale, AZ 85253

James B Ball

Attorney at Ball Santin & McLeran PLC

2999 N 44Th St., Ste. 500

Phoenix, AZ 85018

Erik Daniel Smith

Attorney at Shein Phanse Adkins PC

6720 N Scottsdale Rd., Ste. 261

Scottsdale, AZ 85253

Scott Alan Malm

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC - Phoenix

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2553

Mina C O'Boyle

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC - Phoenix

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2553

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Scott Alan Malm

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC - Phoenix

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2553

Mina C O'Boyle

Attorney at Gust Rosenfeld PLC - Phoenix

1 E Washington St., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2553

 

Court Documents

#212

#211

#210

#209

#208

#206

#205

#204

#203

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

269 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TESTIMONY OF VICTOR WEINTRAUB/JOHN ANDREWS/JOHN SEARBY (Pages 167 through 329, inclusive.) proceedings held on 03/27/2019, before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (RAP) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL EXCERPTED TRANSCRIPT of TESTIMONY OF VICTOR WEINTRAUB (Pages 1 through 166, inclusive.) proceedings held on 03/26/2019, before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (RAP) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE proceedings held on 03/08/2019, before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7249]. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (RAP) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Robert C. Brown of Waldron Evans, PLC for proceedings held on 03/08/19, 03/26/19, and 03/27/19, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (RAP) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) *(AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST FILED AT DOC. #209 ) - TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (3rd Party) by Robert C. Brown of Waldron Evans, PLC for proceedings held on 03/26/19-03/27/19, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (RAP) *Modified to reference amended version and create docket entry relationship on 8/17/2020 (RAP). (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisbursement made in accordance with #203 Order payable to Pandey Hotel Corporation in the amount of $147,900.32, check number 99211937.. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DBG) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #205 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#206) ORDER denying without prejudice the #205 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/6/2019. (LFIG) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#205) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by First Charter Financial Corporation. (Hovore, Franklin) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed June 4, 2019, judgment is entered for Defendant and against Plaintiffs on Counts One, Three, Four and Five of the First Amended Complaint; for Defendant and against Plaintiffs on Counts One and Four of the Counterclaims; for Plaintiffs and against Defendant on Count Three of Defendant's Counterclaim. The Clerk of Court shall remit the $143,000 plus any accrued interest to Defendant Pandey Hotel Corporation. Plaintiffs shall disgorge $24,500 to Defendants. Plaintiffs shall pay $1 to Defendant for Count Four of the First Amended Complaint. All parties shall pay their own attorneys' fees and costs, and this action is hereby terminated. (LFIG) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by First Charter Financial Corporation. (Firestone, Merrick) (Entered: 12/01/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Pandey Hotel Corporation.(Ball, James) (Entered: 11/30/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/24/2015. (LFIG) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pandey Hotel Corporation. (Ball, James) (Entered: 11/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to First American Title Insurance Company, First Charter Financial Corporation, Pandey Hotel Corporation. (ATD) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12351210. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-2361-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ATD) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE re: Consent to Notice of Removal by First American Title Insurance Company . (Malm, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Docket*****State Court record received on 11/19/2015*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by First Charter Financial Corporation: Certificate of Service re: Complaint/Summons/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon First American Title Company on 10/13/2015.*****Certificate of Service filed in state court on 10/15/2015, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/19/2015 for case management purposes.***** (ATD) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Docket*****State Court record received on 11/19/2015*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by First Charter Financial Corporation: Certified Mail Receipt re: Complaint/Summons/Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Pandey Hotel Corporation on 10/20/2015.*****Certified Mail Receipt filed in state court on 10/30/2015, docketed in U.S. District Court on 11/19/2015 for case management purposes.***** (ATD) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2015-054254. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12351210 filed by Pandey Hotel Corporation. (Submitted by James Ball) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (ATD) (Entered: 11/19/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PANDEY HOTEL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helen Rubenstein Holden

Latest cases represented by Lawyer F. Thomas Hovore