This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 15:07:57 (UTC).

First Bank & Trust v. Complete Communications, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 First Bank Trust filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Complete Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04123

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

First Bank & Trust

First Bank & Trust doing business as Firstline Funding Group

Defendants

James Garrett Connor

Sarah Beth Connor

Complete Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David J. Jencks

Attorney at Jencks & Jencks, PC

Po Box 442, 121 N. Egan

Madison, SD 57042

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin D. Tronnes

Attorney at Bangs McCullen Law Firm

Po Box 2670

Rapid City, SD 57709

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#17

(#17) REPLY to #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

16 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Receipt

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Receipt

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Receipt

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Affidavit of David J. Jencks filed by First Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Receipt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Receipt) (Jencks, David) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#14

(#14) Discovery Report (Rule 26(f) Report) by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor.(Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Receipt

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Receipt) (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Elizabeth Conner in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 10/22/2018 (SAC). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conner Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5/11/17 Correspondence from DB Squared to Def, #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/11/17 Email from Firstline to Def, #5 Exhibit 5 - Addendum Purchase/Sale Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email string between attorneys, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Attorney Tronnes to Attorney Jencks, #10 Exhibit 10 - Email from Attorney Jencks to Attorney Tronnes) (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B- Minnehaha County Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A- Minnehaha County Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor from Minnehaha County, case number 49CIV18-002622. Filed in shell case on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Minnehaha County Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Minnehaha County Complaint)(SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to #7 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Affidavit of David J. Jencks filed by First Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Receipt, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Receipt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Receipt) (Jencks, David) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Discovery Report (Rule 26(f) Report) by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor.(Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Receipt) (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Sarah Elizabeth Conner in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) Modified docket text on 10/22/2018 (SAC). (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase and Sale Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conner Guarantee, #3 Exhibit 3 - 5/11/17 Correspondence from DB Squared to Def, #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/11/17 Email from Firstline to Def, #5 Exhibit 5 - Addendum Purchase/Sale Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email string between attorneys, #9 Exhibit 9 - Letter from Attorney Tronnes to Attorney Jencks, #10 Exhibit 10 - Email from Attorney Jencks to Attorney Tronnes) (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel from Judge Piersol)(JLS) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by First Bank & Trust. (Jencks, David) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Complete Communications, Inc.. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Tronnes, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Filing Fee Received from Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2883163. (SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Complete Communications, Inc., James Garrett Connor, Sarah Beth Connor from Minnehaha County, case number 49CIV18-002622. Filed in shell case on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Minnehaha County Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Minnehaha County Complaint)(SLW) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less