This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 10:22:25 (UTC).

FILING ERROR

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 FILING ERROR was filed as an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-OP-45525

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Watauga County

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garry Whitaker

Attorney at Law Office of Garry Whitaker

One North Marshall Street

Winston Salem, NC 27101

 

Court Documents

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Western. Case number 5:18-cv-00064. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/07/2018)

#2

(#2) Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of Ohio Northern, MDL# 2804. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case electronically transferred to District of Ohio Northern. (tmg) [Transferred from ncwd on 5/7/2018.] (Entered: 05/04/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Addendum

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3662735), filed by Watauga County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum)(Whitaker, Garry) [Transferred from ncwd on 5/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketTermination of case (P,R) (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Western. Case number 5:18-cv-00064. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Transfer Order of Judicial Panel MDL transferring case to District of Ohio Northern, MDL# 2804. Matter transferred for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case electronically transferred to District of Ohio Northern. (tmg) [Transferred from ncwd on 5/7/2018.] (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg) [Transferred from ncwd on 5/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3662735), filed by Watauga County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum)(Whitaker, Garry) [Transferred from ncwd on 5/7/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Watauga County is a litigant

Latest cases where Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant