This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Figueroa et al v. Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Figueroa filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall, G. R. Smith and James E. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanisha N Figueroa

Intervenor Plaintiff

Darrion Alexander Ford

Defendants

Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company

DOT Transportation, Inc.

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Wendell Calhoun, III

Attorney at Calhoun Law Firm

206 Queen Street, Suite 1-B, P.O. Box 1988

Vidalia, GA 30475

Alan J. Hamilton

Attorney at Shiver Hamilton, LLC

3340 Peachtree Rd., Suite 950

Atlanta, GA 30326

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

H. Craig Stafford

Attorney at Arnold, Stafford, Randolph & Schaefer

P.O. Box 339

Hinesville, GA 31310

Jeffery L. Arnold

Attorney at Arnold, Stafford, Randolph & Schaefer

P.O. Box 339

Hinesville, GA 31310

Courtney Joiner Anderson

Attorney at C. Joiner Anderson & Associates, PC

P.O. Box 1488

Lyons, GA 30426

Andrew S. Johnson

Attorney at Arnold, Stafford, Randolph & Schaefer

P.O. Box 339

Hinesville, GA 31310

Kimberly L. Copeland

P.O. Box 1091

Jesup, GA 31598-1091

Defendant Attorneys

Hugh Peterson, III

Attorney at McNatt, Greene & Peterson

P.O. Drawer 1168

Vidalia, GA 30475-1168

Mason White

Attorney at Brennan, Harris & Rominger, LLP

P.O. Box 2784

Savannah, GA 31402-2784

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Administratrix of the Estate of Doreona Maesean Figueroa, Deceased). (Hamilton, Alan) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Peterson, Hugh) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION to Intervene by Darrion Alexander Ford. Responses due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #4 MAIN DOCUMENT) (trb). Modified on 10/24/2018 (trb). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(White, Mason) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

8 #1

Proof of Service (State Farm-UM)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 09/27/2018, filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (State Farm-UM))(Calhoun, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed DOT Transportation, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor). (Calhoun, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alan J. Hamilton Receipt Number 113J-2455348, Fee Amount $200, by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor). Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Calhoun, Paul) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/25/18. (trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to DOT Transportation, Inc., Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company, and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor), Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Administratrix of the Estate of Doreona Maesean Figueroa, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiff's Amended Response filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Administratrix of the Estate of Doreona Maesean Figueroa, Deceased). (Hamilton, Alan) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Administratrix of the Estate of Doreona Maesean Figueroa, Deceased). (Hamilton, Alan) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/29/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. (Peterson, Hugh) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Intervene . (trb) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Intervene by Darrion Alexander Ford. Responses due by 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2018: #4 MAIN DOCUMENT) (trb). Modified on 10/24/2018 (trb). (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(White, Mason) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: DOT Transportation, Inc. answer due 12/1/2018. Answer reset due to waiver of service filed on 10/2/18. (jrb) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company answer due 10/18/2018. (trb) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 09/27/2018, filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor). (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service (State Farm-UM))(Calhoun, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: DOT Transportation, Inc. answer due 10/23/2018. (trb) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed DOT Transportation, Inc. Acknowledgement filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor). (Calhoun, Paul) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 09/28/18. (sff) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alan J. Hamilton Receipt Number 113J-2455348, Fee Amount $200, by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor). Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Calhoun, Paul) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/25/18. (trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to DOT Transportation, Inc., Travelers Property and Casualty Insurance Company, and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2452799. (trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Underinsured Motorist Carrier by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor), Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Administratrix of the Estate of Doreona Maesean Figueroa, Deceased). (trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Guardian of L.M.F, a minor, and L.T.F, a minor), Tanisha N Figueroa(Temporary Administratrix of the Estate of Doreona Maesean Figueroa, Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(trb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less