This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 16:29:35 (UTC).

FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 06/01/2017 FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-MD-02779

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Tonianne J. Bongiovanni

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOROUGH OF CARTERET

COUNTY OF HUDSON

RANNEY SCHOOL

LAKEVIEW DAY CAMP

RICHARD GENTILE

STATE-OPERATED SCHOOL DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF NEWARK

CHEROKEE CENTRAL SCHOOLS

THE CITY OF FREMONT

NEW CASTLE SCHOOL DISTRICT

TOWNSHIP OF MEDFORD

THE PAW, INC.

NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT

LAKE TAHOE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

SANTA YNEZ VALLEY UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT

BROWNSVILLE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

FIELDTURF USA, INC.

FIELDTURF, INC.

TARKETT INC.

FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS

In Re

FIELDTURF ARTIFICIAL TURF MARKETING AND SALES PRACTICES LITIGATION

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHRISTOPHER BRENDAN HEALY

Attorney at BATHGATE WEGENER & WOLF PC

One Airport Road

Lakewood, NJ 08701

CURTIS M. PLAZA

Attorney at RIKER, DANZIG, SCHERER, HYLAND & PERRETTI, LLP

One Speedwell Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962

JEFFREY ALLEN BEER, JR.

Attorney at RIKER DANZIG SCHERER HYLAND & PERRETTI LLP

One Speedwell Avenue

Morristown, NJ 07962

LANCE J. KALIK

Attorney at RIKER DANZIG SCHERER HYLAND & PERRETTI, LLP

One Speedwell Avenue, Po Box 1981

Morristown, NJ 07962-1981

MICHAEL M. DICICCO

Attorney at Maggs & McDermott, LLC

3349 Highway 138 Building C, Suite D

Wall, NJ 07719

RYAN SETH MALC

Attorney at BATHGATE WEGENER & WOLF PC

1 Airport Road

Lakewood, NJ 08701

DANIEL C. GIRARD

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

CHRISTOPHER A. SEEGER

Attorney at SEEGER WEISS LLP

55 Challenger Road, 6Th Floor

Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660

ANGELICA M. ORNELAS

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

601 California Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94108

MICHAEL D. CRITCHLEY

Attorney at Critchley, Kinum & DeNoia, LLC

75 Livingston Avenue, Suite 303

Roseland, NJ 07068

BRADLEY KEITH KING

Attorney at AHDOOT & WOLFSON PC

10728 Lindbrook Drive

Los Angeles, CA 90024

MARK JEFFREY DEARMAN

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

120 E. Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432

JAMES E. CECCHI

Attorney at CARELLA BYRNE CECCHI OLSTEIN BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Daniel K Bryson

900 West Morgan Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

Nabil Majed Nachawati, II

Attorney at Attorney at Law

4925 Greenville Ave, Ste 715

Dallas, TX 75206

Defendant Attorneys

GAVIN J. ROONEY

Attorney at LOWENSTEIN SANDLER, PC

65 Livingston Avenue

Roseland, NJ 07068-1791

JOSEPH ALDO FISCHETTI

Attorney at LOWENSTEIN SANDLER LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON, LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019-6064

ROBERT A. ATKINS

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Other Attorneys

Irina J Mazor

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED USDC - NJ BAR

550 North Brand Boulevard Suite 1830

Glendale, CA 91203

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#164

#163

#162

155 #4

Certificate of Service

155 #3

Text of Proposed Order

155 #2

Certification of Vanessa M. Biondo

155 #1

Certification of Correy A. Kamin

#155

154 #4

Certificate of Service

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Exhibit

#3

#2

#1

273 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#164) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Vanessa M. Biondo to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9835612.) (KAMIN, CORREY) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#163) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Lindsey R. Skibell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-9835506.) (KAMIN, CORREY) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#162) ORDER granting #155 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vanessa M. Biondo, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/22/2019. (jem) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#161) ORDER granting #154 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsey "Reid" R. Skibell, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/22/2019. (jem) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#160) NOTICE of Appearance by LARA BUESO BACH on behalf of FIELDTURF TARKETT SAS, FIELDTURF USA, INC., FIELDTURF, INC., TARKETT INC. (BACH, LARA) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#159) ORDER that Alexis Kellert, Esq. withdraws as counsel for the Defendants in this matter and should no longer receive ECF notifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/27/2019. (jem) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#158) Letter from Diane P. Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Notice of Withdrawal)(SULLIVAN, DIANE) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • (#157) TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court are the parties informal discovery disputes as well as their competing proposed schedules. The Court has determined to stay the entry of a schedule until after the discovery disputes are decided. The Court shall advise whether a hearing on the discovery disputes will be scheduled. Pending a decision on the aforementioned discovery disputes, the parties are directed to continue to exchange paper discovery as they are able. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#156) Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J.. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #155 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Vanessa M. Biondo, #154 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey "Reid" R. Skibell. Motions set for 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Letter from Gavin J. Rooney enclosing proposed Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Respond to LakeView Day Camp's Initial Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ROONEY, GAVIN) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from Lance J. Kalik to Court dated 6.14.17. (KALIK, LANCE) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from James E. Cecchi. (CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVE W. BERMAN and JASON A. ZWEIG, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mps) (Entered: 06/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steve W. Berman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CRITCHLEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason A. Zweig to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (CRITCHLEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter from Michael Critchley re #3 Letter. (CRITCHLEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 06/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter from Gavin J. Rooney requesting an initial case management conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ROONEY, GAVIN) (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MDL Notice to Counsel. (jjc) (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (jjc). (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PAW, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NESHANNOCK TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Tarkett U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant