This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2020 at 21:18:18 (UTC).

Feuer v. Baker, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 Feuer filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Baker,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02866

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Defendants

Fredrico F. Pena

Suzanne M. Vautrinot

John R. Shrewsberry

Donald M. James

Michael J. Loughlin

Cynthia Milligan

Susan E. Engel

Theodore F. Craver

Enrique Hernandez, Jr.

Elaine L. Chao

Ronald L. Sargent

Wells Fargo & Company

Carrie L. Tolstedt

John S. Chen

John D. Baker, II

Susan G. Swenson

John G. Stumpf

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alethea M. Sargent

John F. Cove, Jr.

Miles F. Ehrlich

Sverker Kristoffer Hogberg

Jeffrey E. Faucette

Grant P. Fondo

Other Attorneys

Ilene Freier Brookler

Rachele R. Byrd

Jane M. Byrne

Robert Patrick Vance, Jr.

Corey Worcester

Fred Taylor Isquith

Daniel Nathan Shallman

Brittany Nicole DeJong

Richard Martin Heimann

Adam F. Shearer

Carolyn Kubota

Josh Alan Cohen

Richard D. Greenfield

Walter W. Gouldsbury, III

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#127

#126

125 #3

Exhibit 3

125 #2

Exhibit 2

125 #1

Exhibit 1

#125

124 #2

Exhibit 2

124 #1

Exhibit 1

#124

#4

#3

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Verification

#1

155 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Tracy Olivia Zinsou (Zinsou, Tracy) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES AND JOINT STATEMENT RE: RULINGS ON TERMINATED MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #125 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 5/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines and Joint Statement re: Rulings on Terminated Motions to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo & Company, John G. Stumpf, Timothy J. Sloan, Carrie Tolstedt, John D. Baker II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Susan E. Engel, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Donald M. James, Cynthia H. Milligan, Maria R. Morris, Karen B. Peetz, Federico F. Pea, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Judith M. Runstad, Stephen W. Sanger, Ronald L. Sargent, Susan G. Swenson, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Avid Modjtabai, Dawn Martin Harp, Michael J. Loughlin, National General Holdings Corp., National General Insurance Company and R.A. Feuer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 1/17/2020) Modified on 1/17/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case division is incorrect. The correct information, per the ECF notification sent August 21, 2019, is Oakland Division and the case number should be 4:18 -cv-2866 JST. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines and Joint Statement re: Rulings on Terminated Motions to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo & Company (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines and Joint Statement re: Rulings on Terminated Motions to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 1/16/2020) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) NOTICE of Appearance by James Adams Allison Douglas R. Young, C. Brandon Wisoff, Claire Johnson (Allison, James) (Filed on 11/21/2019) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #121 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#121) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by Wells Fargo & Company, John G. Stumpf, Timothy J. Sloan, Carrie Tolstedt, John D. Baker II, Elaine L. Chao, John S. Chen, Celeste A. Clark, Theodore F. Craver, Lloyd H. Dean, Elizabeth A. Duke, Susan E. Engel, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Donald M. James, Cynthia H. Milligan, Maria R. Morris, Karen B. Peetz, Federico F. Pea, Juan A. Pujadas, James H. Quigley, Judith M. Runstad, Stephen W. Sanger, Ronald L. Sargent, Susan G. Swenson, Suzanne M. Vautrinot, Avid Modjtabai, Dawn Martin Harp, Michael J. Loughlin, National General Insurance Company, R.A. Feuer, Franklin Codel and John R. Shrewsberry . (Cullen, Brendan) (Filed on 10/30/2019) Modified on 10/31/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Statement Regarding Clarification of Facts Related to Proposed Settlments by R.A. Feuer. (Gouldsbury, Walter) (Filed on 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) ORDERThese motions are administratively terminated. The parties are instructed to file a joint statement upon conclusion of the state court's consideration of that action indicating whether they still desire rulings on the motions. Motions terminated: #54 MOTION to Dismiss THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ADEQUATELY PLEAD WRONGFUL DEMAND REFUSAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT--[CORRECTION TO DKT#53 filed by Wells Fargo & Company, #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National General Insurance Company, National General Holdings Corp.., ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 17, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jstlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2019) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by Michael J. Loughlin waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by R.A. Feuer. Service waived by John G. Stumpf waiver sent on 5/25/2018, answer due 7/24/2018. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 6/11/2018) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT: Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2018. Judge Alsup's standing orders may be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018) (Entered: 05/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by R.A. Feuer.. (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 5/27/2018) (Entered: 05/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by R.A. Feuer (Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 5/27/2018) (Entered: 05/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/30/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12357518). Filed by R.A. Feuer . (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Verification, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brookler, Ilene) (Filed on 5/16/2018) Modified on 5/16/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less