This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2018 at 06:18:20 (UTC).

Feroz v. Sessions et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 Feroz filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Sessions. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Hughes Haikala and John H England, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

Referral Judge

John H England, III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Muhammed Feroz

Gadsden, AL 35901

Respondents

Patrick Gartland

Sean W. Gallagher

Jeff Sessions

John Kelly

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Bradford Collins Patrick

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Savannah

P.O. Box 8970

Savannah, GA 31412

 

Court Documents

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:17-cv-00113. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(ca) Modified on 8/30/2017 (slt). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2017)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Envelope

#14

(#14) ORDER TRANSFERRING the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to the USDC for the Northern District of Alabama, Middle Division, for further consideration. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this case to that court. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/17/2018. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick Gartland re #11 Response to Order to Show Cause (Patrick, Bradford) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Declaration of Michael Taylor)(Patrick, Bradford) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

11 #1

Attachment A - Declaration of Michael Taylor

12 #1

Envelope

#12

(#12) Letter from Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of Patrick Gartland (Patrick, Bradford) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2017)

5 #1

Prepared 285 Forms

#8

(#8) U.S. Marshal Return as to Attorney General of the U.S. for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 Order, on 10/10/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing the USM to serve a copy of the #1 Petition and a copy of this Order by registered or certified mail upon: (1) the Attorney General of the U.S.; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/29/2017. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2017: #1 Prepared 285 Forms) (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 09/29/2017)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:17-cv-00113. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Case transferred to USDC Northern District of Alabama, Middle Division. File Transferred Electronically. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER TRANSFERRING the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to the USDC for the Northern District of Alabama, Middle Division, for further consideration. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this case to that court. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/17/2018. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick Gartland re #11 Response to Order to Show Cause (Patrick, Bradford) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter from Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Patrick Gartland. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Declaration of Michael Taylor)(Patrick, Bradford) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Collins Patrick on behalf of Patrick Gartland (Patrick, Bradford) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Change of Address by Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) U.S. Marshal Return as to Attorney General of the U.S. for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 Order, on 10/10/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause Response due by 10/27/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) U.S. Marshal Return as to Patrick Gartland and U.S. Attorney for the SDGA for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Muhammed Feroz, #5 Order, on 10/6/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - copy of docket sheet. Return to sender. Mail sent to Muhammed Feroz. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER directing the USM to serve a copy of the #1 Petition and a copy of this Order by registered or certified mail upon: (1) the Attorney General of the U.S.; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the U.S. Attorney for the SDGA. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/29/2017. (ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2017: #1 Prepared 285 Forms) (ca). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 09/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of Address by Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 09/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Change of Address by Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(slt) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 09/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Filing fee payment received, Amount $5.00, Receipt BWK007365. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filing fee was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 9/19/2017. (ca) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Muhammed Feroz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope)(ca) Modified on 8/30/2017 (slt). [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.