This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2018 at 07:32:29 (UTC).

Felps v. Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 Felps filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carmen E. Garza, Gregory J. Fouratt and Robert C. Brack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00811

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

Carmen E. Garza

Robert C. Brack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jonathan Felps

Defendant

Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel A. Verrett

2901 Bee Cave Road, Box L

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Richard E. Olson

Attorney at Hinkle Shanor, LLP

P.O. Box 10

Roswell, NM 88202-0010

John Bridges Brown

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2695 to be connected to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/10/2018. (mm) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Felps.(Olson, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Felps. Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Verrett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Consent of Jonathan Felps

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jonathan Felps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent of Jonathan Felps, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verrett, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • (#8) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • (#7) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's "Meet Me" line at (505) 348-2695 to be connected to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 10/22/2018. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/10/2018. (mm) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Felps.(Olson, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Felps. Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Verrett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Summons Issued as to Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. (ln) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • (#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5986618 re #1 Complaint filed by Jonathan Felps (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Verrett, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Mewbourne Oil Company, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jonathan Felps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Consent of Jonathan Felps, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verrett, Daniel) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less