This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2018 at 05:20:13 (UTC).

Felipe Polanco Diaz v. Reaume et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 Felipe Polanco Diaz filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Reaume. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01982

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Felipe Polanco Diaz

Represa, CA 95671

Defendants

C.O. R. Gomez

Baughman

C.O. E. Torres

Lt. W. Reaume

T. Lindquist

C.O. A. Ademoye

C.O. D. Moisa

C.O. E. England

C.O. D. Henry

C.O. C. Spencer

Sgt. B. Gonzales

C.O. J. Flores Gomez

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction, iled by Plaintiff Felipe Polanco Diaz. (mba) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant C.O. D. Moisa, Lt. W. Reaume, Sgt. B. Gonzales, C.O. A. Ademoye, C.O. E. England, C.O. J. Gomez Flores, C.O. R. Gomez, C.O. D. Henry, C.O. C. Spencer, C.O. E. Torres pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early.(Filing fee $400), FEE DUE filed by Plaintiff Felipe Polanco Diaz. (mba) (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Felipe Polanco Diaz. (car) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) DECLARATION OF FELIPE POLANCO DIAZ filed by Plaintiff Felipe Polanco Diaz. (car) Modified on 3/14/2018 (car). (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Baughman is a litigant