This case was last updated from PACER on 02/05/2019 at 07:36:01 (UTC).

Fedewa v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 Fedewa filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T. S. Ellis, III and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01520

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ritika Fedewa

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juliane Ylenia Smith

Attorney at Paradigm Law PLC

708 Pine Street

Herndon, VA 20170

Defendant Attorney

Donald Richard Pocock

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP (Winston-Salem)

380 Knollwood Street, Suite 530

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Ritika Fedewa.(Smith, Juliane) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Complaint

4 #1

Mag. Consent

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ritika Fedewa. (Smith, Juliane) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A - QWR 1

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - QWR 1, #2 Exhibit B - QWR 2, #3 Exhibit C - Response Letter from Chase (without voluminous enclosures))(Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#6

(#6) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 5), and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 4) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by April 26, 2019. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, January 2, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by January 16, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/2/19. (tfitz, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

4 #2

Pretrial Notice

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#8

(#8) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Waiving Oral Argument (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

3 #3

Exhibit C - Response Letter from Chase (without voluminous enclosures)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6396965.), filed by Chase, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Pocock, Donald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Ritika Fedewa. (Smith, Juliane) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Waiving Oral Argument (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 5), and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 4) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by April 26, 2019. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, January 2, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed by January 16, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/2/19. (tfitz, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Ritika Fedewa.(Smith, Juliane) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 4/26/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III(if parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if parties do file dispositive motions).Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Mag. Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - QWR 1, #2 Exhibit B - QWR 2, #3 Exhibit C - Response Letter from Chase (without voluminous enclosures))(Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, ) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chase, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Pocock, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6396965.), filed by Chase, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Pocock, Donald) Modified on 12/7/2018 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.