This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 09:30:24 (UTC).

FCA US LLC v. Cummins, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 FCA US LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cummins, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis, Avern Cohn and Stephanie Dawkins DavisM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-12883

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Avern Cohn

Referral Judges

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Stephanie Dawkins DavisM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

FCA US LLC

Defendants, Counter Claimants and Counter Defendants

Cummins, Inc.

Johnson Matthew Inc.

Johnson Matthey Inc.

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

John E. Berg

Attorney at Clark Hill

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

James P. Feeney

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2820

Cynthia M. Filipovich

Attorney at Clark Hill

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

Paul L. Nystrom

Attorney at Dykema Gossett (Bloomfield Hills)

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2820

Jay M. Berger

Attorney at Clark Hill (Detroit)

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

Laura Baucus

Attorney at Dykema Gossett (Bloomfield Hills)

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2820

Defendant, Counter Claimant and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Soble

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Lauren M. Loew

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Susan L. Poll Klaessy

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Vanessa L. Miller

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2700

Detroit, MI 48226

Hannah B. Griffin

Attorney at Foley & Larnder LLP

321 North Clark Street, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60654

Jason R. Abel

Attorney at Honigman LLP

660 Woodward Avenue, Suite 2290

Detroit, MI 48226-3506

Gilbert S. Keteltas

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

John Murphy

Attorney at BakerHostetler

2929 Arch Street, 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Gabriel E. Bedoya

Attorney at Honigman LLP

2290 First National Bank, 660 Woodard Avenue

Detroit, MI 48226-3506

John E. Berg

Attorney at Clark Hill

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

James P. Feeney

Attorney at Dykema Gossett

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2820

Cynthia M. Filipovich

Attorney at Clark Hill

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

Paul L. Nystrom

Attorney at Dykema Gossett (Bloomfield Hills)

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2820

Jay M. Berger

Attorney at Clark Hill (Detroit)

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 3500

Detroit, MI 48226-3435

Laura Baucus

Attorney at Dykema Gossett (Bloomfield Hills)

39577 Woodward Avenue, Suite 300

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304-2820

 

Court Documents

#105

#104

#103

#102

#101

#100

#99

#98

#97

5 #8

Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Srikanth Padmanabhano

5 #4

Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeff W. Caldwell

5 #3

Index of Exhibits

5 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order

5 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Temporary Restraining Order

#3

#2

#1

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#105) STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 02/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) ORDER GRANTING JOHNSON MATTHEY, INC.S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF FCA US LLC. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) MOTION to Seal Portions of Its Motion for Summary Judgment Against Plaintiff FCA US LLC by Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Abel, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER GRANTING CUMMINS INC.S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, BRIEF IN SUPPORT, AND ATTACHMENTS THERETO. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) MOTION to Seal Portions of Its Motion For Settlement Conference, Brief in Support of the Motion and Attachments Thereto by Cummins, Inc.. (Soble, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) NOTICE of Appearance by John Murphy on behalf of Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Murphy, John) (Entered: 10/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) NOTICE of Appearance by Gilbert S. Keteltas on behalf of Johnson Matthey Inc.. (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Entered: 10/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Status Conference held on September 8, 2017. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sheri Ward, 313-234-2604) (Number of Pages: 9) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 10/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2017. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Ward, S) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) AMENDED ORDER OF BIFURCATION AND STATYING PROCEEDINGS ON DAMAGES. Signed by District Judge Avern Cohn. (MVer) (Entered: 09/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Avern Cohn: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/8/2017 (Court Reporter: Sheri Ward) (MVer) (Entered: 09/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Counterclaim,,,, , AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, #6 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Counterclaim,,,, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against FCA US LLC by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Warranty) (Miller, Vanessa) (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF HEARING on #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Avern Cohn (MVer) (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXHIBIT 1, Corrected, re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cummins, Inc. (Miller, Vanessa) (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) [STRICKEN] ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , AMENDED, ANSWER to Counterclaim with Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against FCA US LLC by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Warranty) (Miller, Vanessa) Modified on 9/20/2016 (DWor). [RE-FILED: SEE DOCKET ENTRY #9 ] (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jeff W. Caldwell, #5 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Brian Mormino, #6 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Girish Janakiraman, #7 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Richard S. Wagner, #8 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Srikanth Padmanabhano) (Miller, Vanessa) Modified on 9/20/2016 (DWor). [SEE DOCKET ENTRY #7 FOR EXHIBIT 1] (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) [STRICKEN] ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , Verified, COUNTERCLAIM filed by Cummins, Inc. against FCA US LLC by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013 Warranty) (Miller, Vanessa) Modified on 9/20/2016 (DWor). [RE-FILED: SEE DOCKET ENTRY #9 ] (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa L. Miller on behalf of Cummins, Inc.. (Miller, Vanessa) (Entered: 09/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos) (Entered: 08/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Cummins, Inc.* (LHos) (Entered: 08/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by FCA US LLC against Cummins, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5814632 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Berger, Jay) (Entered: 08/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Cummins, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John E. Berg