This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 20:22:04

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by FASTCASE, Inc against Lawriter LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:17-CV-00414
  • Filing Date 02/02/2017
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Copyright
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr
  • Courthouse Georgia Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Lawriter Llc
  • Represented By
    • Joseph William Rohe
    • Kurt Matthew Rozelsky
  • Plaintiff Fastcase, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Joshua Tropper
    • Steven G. Hall
    • Robert G. Brazier

Court Documents

#19

(#19) USCA Opinion received (VACATING AND REMANDING) re: #15...

Fees Apply
#18

(#18) USCA Acknowledgment of #15 Notice of Appeal filed by F...

Fees Apply
#17

(#17) Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Cl...

Fees Apply
#16

(#16) NOTICE Of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter by FASTCAS...

Fees Apply
#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion to Dismiss,...

Fees Apply
#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subjec...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • Notification of Docket Correction re: #19 USCA Opinion. (kac) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
  • 10/29/2018
  • (#19) USCA Opinion received (VACATING AND REMANDING) re: #15 Notice of Appeal filed by FASTCASE, Inc. In accordance with FRAP 41(b), the USCA mandate will issue at a later date. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-14110-HH. (kac) Modified on 10/30/2018 (kac). (Entered: 10/30/2018)
  • 09/18/2017
  • Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #15 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-14110-AA. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (kac) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
  • 09/15/2017
  • (#18) USCA Acknowledgment of #15 Notice of Appeal filed by FASTCASE, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. USCA Case Number 17-14110-A. (kac) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
  • 08/16/2017
  • (#17) Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Clerk's Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #15 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
  • 08/16/2017
  • (#16) NOTICE Of Filing Appeal Transmission Letter by FASTCASE, Inc., re: #15 Notice of Appeal. (kac) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
  • 08/16/2017
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #13 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #14 Clerk's Judgment by FASTCASE, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113E-7329516. Transcript Order Form due on 8/30/2017 (Brazier, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
  • 07/17/2017
  • Civil Case Terminated. (jlm) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
  • 07/17/2017
  • (#14) CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered DISMISSING action without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (jlm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 07/17/2017)
  • 07/17/2017
  • (#13) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 7/17/17. (jlm) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
  • 06/27/2017
  • Clerks Notation re #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
  • 06/20/2017
  • (#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FASTCASE, Inc. by FASTCASE, Inc..(Brazier, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
  • 05/19/2017
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 5/19/17. (jlm) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
  • 05/18/2017
  • (#10) Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 5/18/17. (rsh) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
  • 05/17/2017
  • (#9) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by FASTCASE, Inc.. (Hall, Steven) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
  • 05/16/2017
  • Submission of #4 MOTION to Dismiss , submitted to District Judge Timothy C. Batten. (jlm) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
  • 05/15/2017
  • (#8) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lawriter LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Daniel John McDade), #2 Exhibit A (to McDade Declaration) Contract, #3 Exhibit B (to McDade Declaration) Terms and Conditions)(Rozelsky, Kurt) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
  • 05/01/2017
  • (#7) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FASTCASE, Inc.. (Brazier, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
  • 04/18/2017
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Matthew Rozelsky on behalf of Lawriter LLC (Rozelsky, Kurt) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
  • 04/18/2017
  • Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se) (Entered: 04/18/2017)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.