This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2019 at 08:00:02 (UTC).

Fassy v. Wesco Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 Fassy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wesco Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01056

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shirley Fassy

Defendants

Wesco Insurance Company

Transit Homes, LLC

James Brewer

State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Wiggins Kelley

Attorney at Parker Layrisson Law Firm

200 E Hickory Street

Ponchatoula, LA 70454

James Parker Layrisson

Attorney at Parker Layrisson Law Firm

P.O. Box 1860, 200 E. Hickory St.

Ponchatoula, LA 70454

Meghan Notariano

Attorney at Parker Layrisson Law Firm

P.O. Box 1860

Ponchatoula, LA 70454

Robert Leonard Campbell

Attorney at Williamson Fontenot Campbell & Whittington, LLC

955 Mcclung Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Gene Jones

Attorney at NeunerPate

1001 W Pinhook Rd, Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70503

Jason T. Reed

Attorney at NeunerPate

P. O. Drawer 52828, 1001 West Pinhook Road, Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70505-2828

Christopher Ortte

Attorney at Davidson Meaux Sonnier McElligot Fontenot Gideon & Edwards

810 South Buchanan Street

Lafayette, LA 70501

John Thomas Roethele

Attorney at John T. Roethele, APLC

P.O. Box 400

Denham Springs, LA 70727

Megan Perkins Foreman

Attorney at John T. Roethele, APLC

163 Del Orleans

Denham Springs, LA 70726

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674880. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1869179), filed by James Brewer, Transit Homes, LLC, Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit Citation and Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Transit Homes - MS Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit State Farm Consent, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal to All Parties)(Jones, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit State Farm Consent

1 #2

Exhibit Petition for Damages

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 2/20/2019. Discovery due by 9/11/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/10/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 7/10/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 10/15/2019. Motions shall be filed by 11/13/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/1/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 4/22/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020-6/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Roethele, John) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 03:45 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit Citation and Proof of Service

#4

(#4) MOTION to Enroll Robert L. Campbell as Additional Attorney by Shirley Fassy. (Layrisson, James) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

5 #1

Proposed Pleading;

1 #5

Exhibit Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT by Shirley Fassy. (Layrisson, James) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit Notice of Removal to All Parties

1 #4

Exhibit Transit Homes - MS Secretary of State

#2

(#2) Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. (KAH) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for January 31, 2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 2/20/2019. Discovery due by 9/11/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/10/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 7/10/2019. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2019. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2019. Discovery from Experts due by 10/15/2019. Motions shall be filed by 11/13/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/1/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 4/22/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020-6/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/25/2019. (JSL) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Robert Leonard Campbell, of Williamson, Fontenot, Campbell & Whittington, LLC, as additional counsel of record for Shirley Fassy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Partial Dismissal. All claims asserted by Plaintiff, Shirley Fassy, against Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, are dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs of court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED Defendant, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, is hereby dismissed from these proceedings with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the rights of Plaintiff, Shirley Fassy, to proceed with claims against any and all other parties or persons, including but not limited to Wesco Insurance Company, Trait Homes, LLC, and James Brewer, are reserved. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 01/17/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATUS REPORT by Shirley Fassy. (Layrisson, James) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Partial Dismissal by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Roethele, John) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Enroll Robert L. Campbell as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Enroll Robert L. Campbell as Additional Attorney by Shirley Fassy. (Layrisson, James) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 03:45 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/14/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. (KAH) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 674880. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1869179), filed by James Brewer, Transit Homes, LLC, Wesco Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit Citation and Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Transit Homes - MS Secretary of State, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit State Farm Consent, #7 Exhibit Notice of Removal to All Parties)(Jones, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.