This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:54:54 (UTC).

Farwell v. Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Farwell filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02795

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jacqueline Farwell

Defendant

Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen R. Leffler

Attorney at LEFFLER LAW OFFICE

707 Adams Ave.

Memphis, TN 38105

Defendant Attorney

Craig C. Conley

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz

165 Madison Avenue, Suite 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/28/18. (jjf) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit

#12

(#12) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 5/18/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/1/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

7 #1

Memorandum

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-004574-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925640), filed by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conley, Craig) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit

#13

(#13) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set Friday, 4/26/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCallas chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

7 #3

Exhibit

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Jacqueline Farwell. (Leffler, Stephen) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

#6

(#6) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 12/21/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Notice of Service of Discovery (Conley, Craig) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Rule 26 Disclosures of Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Conley, Craig) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Conley, Craig) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 12/28/18. (jjf) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Notice of Service of Discovery (Conley, Craig) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set Friday, 4/26/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCallas chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 5/18/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/1/2020. (jrs) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • (#11) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/21/2018. Stephen Leffler appeared for the Plaintiff. Craig Conley appeared for the Defendant. A Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for Friday, April 26, 2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 5/18/2020. at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 5-6 days. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 5/8/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Propose Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 5/1/2020. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC Rule 26 Disclosures of Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC (Conley, Craig) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Conley, Craig) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Jacqueline Farwell. (Leffler, Stephen) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Conley, Craig) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 12/21/2018 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-004574-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925640), filed by Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, LLC d/b/a Quince Nursing and Rehabilitation Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conley, Craig) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.