This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:41:31 (UTC).

Fahmy v. Phelps et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Fahmy filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Phelps. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01997

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paul A. Fahmy

Smyrna, DE 19977

Defendants

Lt. Burman

RN Irene Fuh

RN Eric Neba

Estate of Lt. Floyd

Capt. Marcello Rispoli

Commissioner Perry Phelps

Lt. Michael Welcome

Officer Thomas P. Runyon

Jane/John Does

Lt. Heishman

David Pierce

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Letter to Paul Fahmy, from the Clerk of Court, responding to #6 Letter requesting clarification concerning filing fee payments. (ceg) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#5

(#5) ORDER: Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application and certified copy of trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (lak) Modified on 12/21/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER: Civil Action 18-1042-RGA is REOPENED. The Clerk of Court is directed to DOCKET the Complaint (D.I. 1) and sealed exhibits (D.I. 2) from Civil Action No. 18-1997-RGA as the Amended Complaint and sealed exhibits in Civil action No. 18-1042-RGA. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Civil Action No. 18-1997-RGA. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2019. (nms) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Burman, Jane/John Does, Estate of Lt. Floyd, Irene Fuh, Heishman, Eric Neba, Perry Phelps, David Pierce, Marcello Rispoli, Thomas P. Runyon, Michael Welcome (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Paul A. Fahmy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Letter to Judge Andrews, from Paul Fahmy, received on 1/4/2019, requesting clarification concerning filing fee payments. (ceg) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CLOSED per D.I. #8 . (nms) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: Civil Action 18-1042-RGA is REOPENED. The Clerk of Court is directed to DOCKET the Complaint (D.I. 1) and sealed exhibits (D.I. 2) from Civil Action No. 18-1997-RGA as the Amended Complaint and sealed exhibits in Civil action No. 18-1042-RGA. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE Civil Action No. 18-1997-RGA. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2019. (nms) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter to Paul Fahmy, from the Clerk of Court, responding to #6 Letter requesting clarification concerning filing fee payments. (ceg) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter to Judge Andrews, from Paul Fahmy, received on 1/4/2019, requesting clarification concerning filing fee payments. (ceg) Modified on 1/4/2019 (nms). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Filing Fee of $350.00 Assessed. Plaintiff shall submit IFP application and certified copy of trust fund account statement. Failure to submit items within 30 days will result in dismissal of action without prejudice (Copy to pltf. with Mag. Consent Form). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2018. (lak) Modified on 12/21/2018 (nms). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) [SEALED] EXHIBITS to D.I. #1 Complaint, by Paul A. Fahmy. (nmg) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Burman, Jane/John Does, Estate of Lt. Floyd, Irene Fuh, Heishman, Eric Neba, Perry Phelps, David Pierce, Marcello Rispoli, Thomas P. Runyon, Michael Welcome (No IFP, No Fee Paid) - filed by Paul A. Fahmy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.