This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2018 at 07:11:41 (UTC).

Fabric Selection, Inc. v. Ace Fashions et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2018 Fabric Selection, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Ace Fashions. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frederick F. Mumm and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08841

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fabric Selection, Inc.

Defendants

Ace Fashions

M. Brock

What She Wants Boutique

BJ21 Textile, Inc.

A&T Trading US, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10

Clothingunder10, Inc.

MR Walmart Inc.

A and T Trading US, Inc

Walmart Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Stephen M Doniger

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Trevor William Barrett

Attorney at Doninger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Jeff A Mann

Attorney at Jeff Mann Law Offices

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1428

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Bijal V Vakil

Attorney at White and Case LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2433

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., identifying Walmart Inc.. (Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Walmart Inc. answer now due 12/7/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Attorney Bijal V Vakil added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#16

(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc., upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Carlos Paz, Person Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 02:00 PM. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BJ21 Textile, Inc., (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant What She Wants Boutique, (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answers #10 , #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BJ21 Textile, Inc..(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party BJ21 Textile, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant What She Wants Boutique.(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party What She Wants Boutique(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants A and T Trading US, Inc, Ace Fashions, BJ21 Textile, Inc., Clothingunder10, Inc., M. Brock, Walmart Inc., What She Wants Boutique. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22572145 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Fabric Selection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., identifying Walmart Inc.. (Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Walmart Inc. answer now due 12/7/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Attorney Bijal V Vakil added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc., upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Agent for Service c/o Carlos Paz, Person Authorized to Receive in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 02:00 PM. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. (jre) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BJ21 Textile, Inc., (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant What She Wants Boutique, (Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answers #10 , #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BJ21 Textile, Inc..(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party BJ21 Textile, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant What She Wants Boutique.(Attorney Jeff A Mann added to party What She Wants Boutique(pty:dft))(Mann, Jeff) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants A and T Trading US, Inc, Ace Fashions, BJ21 Textile, Inc., Clothingunder10, Inc., M. Brock, Walmart Inc., What She Wants Boutique. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jp) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22572145 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Fabric Selection, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Fabric Selection, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FABRIC SELECTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trevor William Barrett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin M Gomes