This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 07:17:25 (UTC).

Eyssen v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Eyssen filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02311

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon W. Eyssen

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gordon E. Schmid

Attorney at Ste. D-3

10850 Pearl Road

Strongsville, OH 44136

Defendant Attorney

Lauren E. Hume

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice - Tax Division

P.O. Box 55

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Motion for extension of time until February 4, 2019 to answer complaint filed by Defendant United States of America. (Hume, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#5

(#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon United States of America on 10/5/18, and on Commissioner, Internal Revenue Service on 10/10/2018, filed on behalf of Jon W. Eyssen. (H,D) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/10/2018 filed on behalf of Jon W. Eyssen. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,S) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#2

(#2) Original Summons issued to counsel over the counter for service upon United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney, Internal Revenue Service and U.S. Attorney General. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit G - Letter

1 #7

Exhibit F -Form 843

1 #6

Exhibit E - Form 843

1 #5

Exhibit D - Form 843

1 #4

Exhibit C - Form 843

1 #3

Exhibit B - Form 843

1 #2

Exhibit A - IRS penalty forms

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against United States of America. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660108331. Filed by Jon W. Eyssen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - IRS penalty forms, #3 Exhibit B - Form 843, #4 Exhibit C - Form 843, #5 Exhibit D - Form 843, #6 Exhibit E - Form 843, #7 Exhibit F -Form 843, #8 Exhibit G - Letter) (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #6 Motion for extension of time until February 4, 2019 to answer complaint. United States of America answer due 2/4/2019. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/29/2018.(R,Sh) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion for extension of time until February 4, 2019 to answer complaint filed by Defendant United States of America. (Hume, Lauren) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon United States of America on 10/5/18, and on Commissioner, Internal Revenue Service on 10/10/2018, filed on behalf of Jon W. Eyssen. (H,D) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon U.S. Attorney General on 10/10/2018 filed on behalf of Jon W. Eyssen. Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (M,S) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney General Receipt # 7018 0360 0001 7554 1275, Internal Revenue Service Receipt # 7018 0360 0001 7554 1268 and U.S Attorney Receipt # 7018 0360 0001 7554 1282 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Original Summons issued to counsel over the counter for service upon United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney, Internal Revenue Service and U.S. Attorney General. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against United States of America. Filing fee paid. $400.00. Receipt # 14660108331. Filed by Jon W. Eyssen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - IRS penalty forms, #3 Exhibit B - Form 843, #4 Exhibit C - Form 843, #5 Exhibit D - Form 843, #6 Exhibit E - Form 843, #7 Exhibit F -Form 843, #8 Exhibit G - Letter) (D,Ky) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less