This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2018 08:02:02

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by Exocad Gmbh against B D Dental in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Utah District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:17-CV-01252
  • Filing Date 12/04/2017
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Intellectual Property - Copyright
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Jill N. Parrish
  • Courthouse Utah District

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Exocad Gmbh
  • Represented By
    • Karthik Nadesan
    • David A. Jones
  • Defendant B&d Dental
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Daniel Jung
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #7 fil...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of ...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Registe...

Fees Apply
4 #3

Text of Proposed Order

Fees Apply
4 #2

Exhibit B: Electronic case filing registration form

Fees Apply
4 #1

Exhibit A: Application for pro hac vice admission

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian B. Darville ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/20/17. (ss) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
  • 12/20/2017
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order #7 filed by Plaintiff exocad GmbH (Nadesan, Karthik) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
  • 12/19/2017
  • (#7) CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/19/17. (ss) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
  • 12/05/2017
  • (#5) Report on the Filing of an action mailed to the Register of Copyrights Office. (tlh) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
  • 12/04/2017
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian B. Darville for exocad GmbH. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/4/17. (dla) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
  • 12/04/2017
  • (#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brian B. Darville , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-2894059, filed by Plaintiff exocad GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Application for pro hac vice admission, #2 Exhibit B: Electronic case filing registration form, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nadesan, Karthik) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
  • 12/04/2017
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff exocad GmbH. (Nadesan, Karthik) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
  • 12/04/2017
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-2894039) filed by exocad GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Copyright Registration, #2 Exhibit 2: Trademark Registration, #3 Exhibit 3: License Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4: Initial Order Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet ) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Nadesan, Karthik) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
  • 12/04/2017
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff exocad GmbH is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 12/04/2017)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.