This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2019 at 07:53:25 (UTC).

EXCEL PHARMACY SERVICES, LLC v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 EXCEL PHARMACY SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-04804

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXCEL PHARMACY SERVICES, LLC

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSURANCE COMPANY

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

PEERLESS INSURANCE

LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC.

EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU

PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

LM INSURANCE CORPORATION

LIBERTY NORTHWEST INSURANCE CORP.

COLORADO CASUALTY COMPANY

EXCELSIOR INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID S. SENOFF

Attorney at Anapol Weiss

One Logan Square, 130 North 18Th Street, Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

CLAYTON PATRICK FLAHERTY

Attorney at ANAPOL WEISS

One Logan Sq, 130 N 18Th St Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

HILLARY B. WEINSTEIN

Attorney at ANAPOL WEISS

One Logan Square, 130 N. 18Th Street, Suite 1600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

FREDERICK P. MARCZYK

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Streets

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TIMOTHY J. O'DRISCOLL

Attorney at DRINKER, BIDDLE AND REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#30

#29

28 #6

Exhibit 6

28 #5

Exhibit 5

28 #3

Exhibit 3

19 #3

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

19 #2

Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Remand

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#19

#3

#2

1 #6

Case Management Track Form

1 #5

Designation Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

EX A PART 2

1 #2

EX A PART 1

1 #1

NOTICE

#1

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EXCEL PHARMACY SERVICES, LLC. (SENOFF, DAVID) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Certificate of Service re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (O'DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/21/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Certification of Frederick P. Marczyk re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(O'DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/21/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Certification Of Beth Goscinski In Support re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/21/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) BRIEF in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY) Modified on 12/21/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • (#25) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ti, ) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Certification of Beth Goscinski re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim On Which Relief Can Be Granted by AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY, COLORADO CASUALTY COMPANY, EXCELSIOR INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY NORTHWEST INSURANCE CORP., PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (MARCZYK, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/6/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Certification of Michael Hass re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim On Which Relief Can Be Granted by AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY, COLORADO CASUALTY COMPANY, EXCELSIOR INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY NORTHWEST INSURANCE CORP., PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS. (MARCZYK, FREDERICK) Modified on 12/6/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, for Failure to State a Claim On Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY, COLORADO CASUALTY COMPANY, EXCELSIOR INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY NORTHWEST INSURANCE CORP., PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(O'DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC., LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION, PEERLESS INSURANCE.Brief. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim)(O'DRISCOLL, TIMOTHY) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LIBERTY INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL AGENCY CORPORATION, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC. for PEERLESS INSURANCE. by PEERLESS INSURANCE.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL AGENCY CORPORATION, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY INSURANCE HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY-USA INSURANCE CORPORATION, Corporate Parent PEERLESS INSURANCE COMPANY for PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. by PEERLESS INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 11/7/2018) (amas, ). (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC. for LM INSURANCE CORPORATION. by LM INSURANCE CORPORATION.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC. for LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC. for LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. by LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LIBERTY INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL AGENCY CORPORATION, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC., Corporate Parent PEERLESS INSURANCE COMPANY for EXCELSIOR INSURANCE COMPANY. by EXCELSIOR INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC. for EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU. by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent LIBERTY INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL AGENCY CORPORATION, Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY INC., Corporate Parent SAFECO CORPORATION for AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY. by AMERICAN STATES INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL HOLDING COMPANY, INC., Corporate Parent LIBERTY MUTUAL GROUP, INC. for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF WAUSAU, LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LM INSURANCE CORPORATION from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 181001420. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 187534) (Attachments: #1 NOTICE, #2 EX A PART 1, #3 EX A PART 2, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(amas) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Colorado Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Excelsior Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where LIBERTY NORTHWEST INSURANCE COMPANY A/S/O CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH is a litigant

Latest cases where Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant