This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2019 at 07:38:48 (UTC).

Everetts v. Bad Boy Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 Everetts filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Bad Boy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chad Everetts

Defendants

Bad Boy Inc

Bad Boy Mowers Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Vanessa Kinney

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Stevens

Attorney at Fuqua Campbell PA

3700 Cantrell Road, Suite 205

Little Rock, AR 72202

Phil W. Campbell

Attorney at Fuqua Campbell PA

3700 Cantrell Road, Suite 205

Little Rock, AR 72202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/14/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/10/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/30/2018. (slb) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Stevens on behalf of All Defendants (Stevens, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bad Boy Mowers Inc.(Campbell, Phil) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bad Boy Inc.(Campbell, Phil) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Phil W. Campbell on behalf of Bad Boy Inc, Bad Boy Mowers Inc (Campbell, Phil) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chad Everetts. Bad Boy Inc served on 11/12/2018; Bad Boy Mowers Inc served on 11/12/2018. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Chad Everetts against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069459. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bad Boy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phil W. Campbell