This case was last updated from PACER on 04/28/2018 at 06:15:39 (UTC).

Everett v. Smith & Nephew Inc

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 Everett filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Smith Nephew Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01217

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vance Everett

Defendant

Smith & Nephew Inc.

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Maryland for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Catherine C. Blake. Signed by the Chair of the Panel(ml) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Vance Everett.(Smith, T) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#10

(#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vance Everett. (Smith, T) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by T Matthew Smith on behalf of Vance Everett (Smith, T) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

#7

(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Peition by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE . (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Smith & Nephew Inc . (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Ottaway, Larry) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service - Smith & Nephew

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Return of Service - Smith & Nephew

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2018-986 filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service - Smith & Nephew, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service - Smith & Nephew, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Maryland for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Catherine C. Blake. Signed by the Chair of the Panel(ml) (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filed by Vance Everett.(Smith, T) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vance Everett. (Smith, T) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by T Matthew Smith on behalf of Vance Everett (Smith, T) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Smith & Nephew Inc answer due 4/18/2018.. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 3/14/2018. (mb) (Entered: 03/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Peition by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE . (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Smith & Nephew Inc . (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Smith & Nephew Inc (Ottaway, Larry) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2661204. (Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2018-986 filed by Smith & Nephew Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - Return of Service - Smith & Nephew, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Service - Smith & Nephew, #5 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ac) (Entered: 03/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.