This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:29:50 (UTC).

Evanston Insurance Company v. The Break I Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Evanston Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Break I Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karon O Bowdre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01197

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karon O Bowdre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Evanston Insurance Company

Defendants

Amanda Beasley

The Break I Inc

The Break I Inc d/b/a The Break Restaurant & Billiards Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jannea S Rogers

Attorney at ADAMS & REESE LLP

11 North Water Street, Suite 23200

Grand Bay, AL 36541

R Scott Hetrick

Attorney at ADAMS & REESE LLP

P O Box 1348

Mobile, AL 36633

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Charles Somma

Attorney at JOSEPH C SOMMA PC

2107 5Th Avenue North, Suite 301

Birmingham, AL 35203

J Allston Macon, III

Attorney at SOMMA & MACON PC

2084 Valleydale Road

Birmingham, AL 35244

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/29/2018. (FNC) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Break I Inc.(Macon, J) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. The Break I Inc served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Hetrick, R) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evanston Insurance Company. filed by Evanston Insurance Company (Hetrick, R) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Amanda Beasley, The Break I Inc., returned to pltf for service (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #11

Exhibit 11

1 #10

Exhibit 10

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Amanda Beasley, The Break I Inc, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 8/29/2018. (FNC) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Break I Inc.(Macon, J) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evanston Insurance Company. The Break I Inc served on 8/7/2018, answer due 8/28/2018. (Hetrick, R) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evanston Insurance Company. filed by Evanston Insurance Company (Hetrick, R) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Amanda Beasley, The Break I Inc., returned to pltf for service (MRR, ) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3143251 (B4601090956). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Amanda Beasley, The Break I Inc, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(KEK). (Hetrick, R) Modified on 7/31/2018 (MRR, ). (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Amanda Beasley, The Break I Inc, filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(KEK) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less