This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2019 at 07:26:01 (UTC).

Evans v. Orthopedic Associates, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Evans filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Orthopedic Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01978

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany Evans

Defendant

Orthopedic Associates, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melvin David Kennedy

Cyrus C. Dashtaki

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth S. Silker

Steven H. Schwartz

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Silker for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Silker, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tiffany Evans Tiffany Evans waiver signed on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. (Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Tiffany Evans.. (Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Cyrus C. Dashtaki for Plaintiff Tiffany Evans. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #4

Waiver of Service waiver form

1 #3

EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit A

1 #2

Original Filing Form original filing form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed against defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC with receipt number 0865-6892405, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Tiffany Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit A, #4 Waiver of Service)(Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Silker for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Silker, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Steven H. Schwartz for Defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Tiffany Evans Tiffany Evans waiver signed on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019. (Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Tiffany Evans.. (Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Cyrus C. Dashtaki for Plaintiff Tiffany Evans. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed against defendant Orthopedic Associates, LLC with receipt number 0865-6892405, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Tiffany Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter Exhibit A, #4 Waiver of Service)(Kennedy, Melvin) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less