This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2018 at 08:07:58 (UTC).

Evans v. Hutchinson

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Evans filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Hutchinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Harry S Mattice, Jr and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00177

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Timothy Evans

Mountain City, TN 37683

Respondent

Ken Hutchinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Nicholas S Bolduc

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (Nashville)

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ken Hutchinson.(Bolduc, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

11 #24

Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 3 of Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction Appeal

11 #23

Exhibit Transcript of Post-Conviction Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction App

11 #17

Exhibit Opinion of the Criminal Court of Appeals on Direct Appeal

11 #14

Exhibit Motion for New Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal

11 #13

Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion for New Trial on Direct Appeal

11 #12

Exhibit Exhibit 63 of Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal

11 #11

Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal

11 #10

Exhibit Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal

11 #9

Exhibit Volume IV of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal

11 #8

Exhibit Volume III of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal

11 #7

Exhibit Volume II of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal

11 #6

Exhibit Volume I of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal

11 #5

Exhibit Supplemental Technical Record on Direct Appeal

11 #4

Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Redact the Indictment on Direct Appea

11 #2

Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Joinder on Direct Appeal

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General containing 29 volumes of transcript. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Joinder on Direct Appeal, #3 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Sever on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Redact the Indictment on Direct Appeal, #5 Exhibit Supplemental Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #6 Exhibit Volume I of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #7 Exhibit Volume II of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #8 Exhibit Volume III of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #9 Exhibit Volume IV of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #10 Exhibit Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 63 of Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #13 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion for New Trial on Direct Appeal, #14 Exhibit Motion for New Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #15 Exhibit Brief of Appellant on Direct Appeal, #16 Exhibit Brief of State on Direct Appeal, #17 Exhibit Opinion of the Criminal Court of Appeals on Direct Appeal, #18 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review on Direct Appeal, #19 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review Dismissed as Untimely on Direct Appeal, #20 Exhibit Technical Record on Post-Conviction Appeal, #21 Exhibit Inmate Affidavit for Delayed Discretionary Review on Post-Conviction Appeal, #22 Exhibit Delayed Discretionary Review Application Dismissed on Post-Conviction Appeal, #23 Exhibit Transcript of Post-Conviction Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction Appeal, #24 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 3 of Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction Appeal, #25 Exhibit Brief of Appellant on Post-Conviction Appeal, #26 Exhibit Brief of Appellee on Post-Conviction Appeal, #27 Exhibit Opinion of the Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal, #28 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review on Post-Conviction Appeal, #29 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review Denied on Post-Conviction Appeal)(Bolduc, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#2

(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Timothy Evans.(SAC, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ken Hutchinson.(Bolduc, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF FILING w/certificate of service and INDEX OF RECORD of Rule 5 materials submitted by Attorney General containing 29 volumes of transcript. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion for Joinder on Direct Appeal, #3 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Sever on Direct Appeal, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Redact the Indictment on Direct Appeal, #5 Exhibit Supplemental Technical Record on Direct Appeal, #6 Exhibit Volume I of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #7 Exhibit Volume II of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #8 Exhibit Volume III of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #9 Exhibit Volume IV of Trial Transcript on Direct Appeal, #10 Exhibit Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 63 of Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #13 Exhibit Transcript of Hearing on Motion for New Trial on Direct Appeal, #14 Exhibit Motion for New Trial Exhibits on Direct Appeal, #15 Exhibit Brief of Appellant on Direct Appeal, #16 Exhibit Brief of State on Direct Appeal, #17 Exhibit Opinion of the Criminal Court of Appeals on Direct Appeal, #18 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review on Direct Appeal, #19 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review Dismissed as Untimely on Direct Appeal, #20 Exhibit Technical Record on Post-Conviction Appeal, #21 Exhibit Inmate Affidavit for Delayed Discretionary Review on Post-Conviction Appeal, #22 Exhibit Delayed Discretionary Review Application Dismissed on Post-Conviction Appeal, #23 Exhibit Transcript of Post-Conviction Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction Appeal, #24 Exhibit Exhibits 1 and 3 of Evidentiary Hearing on Post-Conviction Appeal, #25 Exhibit Brief of Appellant on Post-Conviction Appeal, #26 Exhibit Brief of Appellee on Post-Conviction Appeal, #27 Exhibit Opinion of the Tennessee Court of Criminal Appeals on Post-Conviction Appeal, #28 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review on Post-Conviction Appeal, #29 Exhibit Application for Discretionary Review Denied on Post-Conviction Appeal)(Bolduc, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Copy mailed to plaintiff Timothy Evans (DJH, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondent SHALL have up to and including September 26, 2018 to file his response to the petition. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 9/6/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ken Hutchinson. (Bolduc, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE: Correction of Address by Timothy Evans. (SAC, )Note: Address did not change from NECC. Notice states he was confused from Clerk's notice Doc. No. #5 . (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas S Bolduc on behalf of Ken Hutchinson (Bolduc, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.Clerk is DIRECTED to serve copies of the petition to Respondent. Respondent is ORDERED to answer within 30 days. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/6/2018. (SAC, )Order mailed to Evans. Order and Petition mailed to Warden Hutchinson. (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (SAC, )Notice mailed to Evans. (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for expansion of the record by Timothy Evans. (SAC, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition #2 filed by Timothy Evans. (SAC, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Timothy Evans.(SAC, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Evans. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(SAC, ) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less