This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:56:21 (UTC).

Evans v. Director of patient care et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Evans filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Director of patient care. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Patrick A. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24064

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Patrick A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmie Markell Evans

Miami, FL 33125

Defendants

Daniel Junior

Odalis Pereire

Rosa Costonzo

Calos Migoya

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans; Recommending that the instant complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety pursuant to 1915(e)(2) (ii) and 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and as wholly frivolous, and that the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

1 #1

Complaint

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie Markell Evans. (ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Director of Corrections, Director of patient care, President of Jackson Health System, Supervisor. Filing fee $ 350.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER ADOPTING #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans Recommending that the instant complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety pursuant to 1915(e)(2)(ii) and 1915A. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act; U.S.C. 1983 against Rosa Costonzo, Daniel Junior, Calos Migoya, Odalis Pereire, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans.(drz) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Jimmie Markell Evans. (dj) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

1 #2

Summon(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • (#10) PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/5/2018. (br) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ADOPTING #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans Recommending that the instant complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety pursuant to 1915(e)(2)(ii) and 1915A. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/2/2018. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act; U.S.C. 1983 against Rosa Costonzo, Daniel Junior, Calos Migoya, Odalis Pereire, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans.(drz) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #6 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/16/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Jimmie Markell Evans. (dj) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans; Recommending that the instant complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety pursuant to 1915(e)(2) (ii) and 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and as wholly frivolous, and that the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/9/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie Markell Evans. (ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Director of Corrections, Director of patient care, President of Jackson Health System, Supervisor. Filing fee $ 350.00. IFP Filed, filed by Jimmie Markell Evans. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.