This case was last updated from PACER on 12/15/2018 at 17:25:31 (UTC).

Eustice v. State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 Eustice filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr, John W. deGravelles and Shelly D. Dick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01008

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judges

John W. deGravelles

Shelly D. Dick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher D. Eustice

Houston, TX 77079

Defendants

State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College

Megan C. Martter

Ryan Barsa

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Ryan Barsa, Megan C. Martter, State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. (NOTICE: Summons mailed to the Pro-se Plaintiff for service.) (EDC) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

8 #1

Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Order)(EDC) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

7 #2

envelope

7 #1

cover letter

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Defendants by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing and #4 Motion for Permission to Be Excused From Paying Pacer Fees. Plaintiff may elect, however, to receive notices from the Court electronically and if so chooses, may complete and fax the attached Pro Se E-Service and E-Notice Consent Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/04/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the complete filing fee in this matter on or before 12/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/04/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

4 #1

Order

#4

(#4) MOTION for Permission to Be Excused from Paying Pacer Fees by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Order)(EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

3 #1

Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Order)(EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher D. Eustice. (EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

1 #5

envelope

1 #4

cover letter

1 #3

civil cover sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ryan Barsa, Megan C. Martter, State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, filed by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 summons, #3 civil cover sheet, #4 cover letter, #5 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • Confirmation of receipt of payment from Christopher Eustice in the amount of $400.00. Transaction posted on 12/13/2018. Receipt number 4699028898 processed by eclement. (IJE) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Ryan Barsa, Megan C. Martter, State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College. (NOTICE: Summons mailed to the Pro-se Plaintiff for service.) (EDC) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Order)(EDC) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve the Defendants by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing and #4 Motion for Permission to Be Excused From Paying Pacer Fees. Plaintiff may elect, however, to receive notices from the Court electronically and if so chooses, may complete and fax the attached Pro Se E-Service and E-Notice Consent Form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/04/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Set Deadlines: Filing Fee due by 12/26/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay the complete filing fee in this matter on or before 12/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/04/2018. (NLT) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Case reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Permission to Be Excused from Paying Pacer Fees, #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Permission to Be Excused from Paying Pacer Fees by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Order)(EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Order)(EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher D. Eustice. (EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ryan Barsa, Megan C. Martter, State of Louisiana through the Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, filed by Christopher D. Eustice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 summons, #3 civil cover sheet, #4 cover letter, #5 envelope)(EDC) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less