This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2019 at 07:43:55 (UTC).

Etienne v. Edmark

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 Etienne filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Edmark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea K. Johnstone and Steven J. McAuliffe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01156

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

Presiding Judge

Steven J. McAuliffe

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dickens Etienne

Respondents

NH State Prison, Acting Warden

NH State Prison, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Donna J. Brown

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. On or before sixty days from the date of this Order, Etienne is granted leave to file a statement showing cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (Follow up on Show Cause Response on 3/4/2019.(lml) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

3 #17

Exhibit Motion for Services Expert Psychiatrist

3 #16

Exhibit Attorney Behzad Mirhashem Deposition

3 #15

Exhibit Dr. Fife Deposition

3 #10

Exhibit Transcript Motion Hearing 12/21/09

3 #9

Exhibit Attorney Timothy Landry Deposition

3 #8

Exhibit Supplemental Memo Supporting Substituted Motion

3 #7

Exhibit Social History Report

3 #6

Exhibit Supreme Court Order 3/29/18

3 #5

Exhibit Merrimack Superior Court Order 1/24/18

3 #4

Exhibit Motion Attachments 13-14

3 #3

Exhibit Motion Attachment 12

3 #2

Exhibit Motion Attachments 1 - 11

3 #1

Exhibit Substituted Motion for Petitioner's Request

#3

(#3) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dickens Etienne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substituted Motion for Petitioner's Request, #2 Exhibit Motion Attachments 1 - 11, #3 Exhibit Motion Attachment 12, #4 Exhibit Motion Attachments 13-14, #5 Exhibit Merrimack Superior Court Order 1/24/18, #6 Exhibit Supreme Court Order 3/29/18, #7 Exhibit Social History Report, #8 Exhibit Supplemental Memo Supporting Substituted Motion, #9 Exhibit Attorney Timothy Landry Deposition, #10 Exhibit Transcript Motion Hearing 12/21/09, #11 Exhibit Discovery Pages 2102, 2105, 2106, #12 Exhibit Dr. Drukteinis Report, #13 Exhibit Petitioner's Motion to Strike, #14 Exhibit Dr. Drukteinis Deposition, #15 Exhibit Dr. Fife Deposition, #16 Exhibit Attorney Behzad Mirhashem Deposition, #17 Exhibit Motion for Services Expert Psychiatrist)(Brown, Donna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1745229.) filed by Dickens Etienne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Donna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1745178.) filed by Dickens Etienne.(Brown, Donna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. On or before sixty days from the date of this Order, Etienne is granted leave to file a statement showing cause why his 2254 petition should not be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (Follow up on Show Cause Response on 3/4/2019.(lml) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1156-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DUPLICATE PAYMENT: Dickens Etienne submitted a duplicate payment in the amount of $5.00, receipt no. 0102-1745229, re: #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case. To request a refund, the filer shall complete the #Request for Refund Form available on the court's website and submit it to the clerk's office either via email or conventionally in paper.(ej) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - New Case Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dickens Etienne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Substituted Motion for Petitioner's Request, #2 Exhibit Motion Attachments 1 - 11, #3 Exhibit Motion Attachment 12, #4 Exhibit Motion Attachments 13-14, #5 Exhibit Merrimack Superior Court Order 1/24/18, #6 Exhibit Supreme Court Order 3/29/18, #7 Exhibit Social History Report, #8 Exhibit Supplemental Memo Supporting Substituted Motion, #9 Exhibit Attorney Timothy Landry Deposition, #10 Exhibit Transcript Motion Hearing 12/21/09, #11 Exhibit Discovery Pages 2102, 2105, 2106, #12 Exhibit Dr. Drukteinis Report, #13 Exhibit Petitioner's Motion to Strike, #14 Exhibit Dr. Drukteinis Deposition, #15 Exhibit Dr. Fife Deposition, #16 Exhibit Attorney Behzad Mirhashem Deposition, #17 Exhibit Motion for Services Expert Psychiatrist)(Brown, Donna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1745229.) filed by Dickens Etienne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Donna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS 2241/2254. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number 0102-1745178.) filed by Dickens Etienne.(Brown, Donna) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less