This case was last updated from PACER on 05/23/2019 at 10:52:36 (UTC).

Estrada v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 Estrada filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert N. Scola, Jr and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-24386

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Scola, Jr

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose D. Estrada

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Craig Thomas Downs

Attorney at The "Downs Law Group"

3250 Mary Street Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Nathan Lee Nelson

Attorney at The Downs Law Group

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Michael D Dunlavy

Attorney at The Ferraro Law Firm, P.A.

600 Brickell Avenue, Suite 3800

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Hildy M. Sastre

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon

201 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 2400

Miami, FL 33131-4332

Jennifer Ann McLoone

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

201 South Biscayne Blvd, Suite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

Katherine Grace Mastrucci

Attorney at Shook, Hardy and Bacon LLP

201 S. Biscayne Blvd, Suite 3200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Joseph P. Farina. Mediation Hearing set for 5/16/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#25

RESTRICTED

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Compliance With Order of Referral to Mediation by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. re #18 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#23

(#23) Order Granting Motion to Withdraw granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz and Michael D Dunlavy withdrawn from case Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Vanessa Diaz. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#22

(#22) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by Vanessa E. Diaz for / by Jose D. Estrada. Responses due by 4/2/2019 (Nelson, Nathan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#21

(#21) STATUS REPORT JOINT INTERIM STATUS REPORT by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D Dunlavy on behalf of Jose D. Estrada. Attorney Michael D Dunlavy added to party Jose D. Estrada(pty:pla). (Dunlavy, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr., Calendar Call set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/28/2019.) Deadline to join additional parties or amend pleadings 1/8/2019; Deadline to file joint interim status report, 3/12/2019; Deadline to complete fact discovery 4/30/2019; Deadline for Consent to Jurisdiction before the designated Magistrate Judge for final disposition, 6/4/2019; Deadline to complete expert discovery, 6/28/2019; Deadline for the filing of all dispositive and Daubert motions, 7/24/2019; Deadline for the filing of other pretrial motions, including motions in limine, 9/17/2019; Deadline to file joint pretrial stipulation, 10/15/2019; Deadline to file proposed jury instructions, 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (mno) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT regarding Venue by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. , and Plaintiff, Jose Estrada (Haycraft, Don) Modified on 10/18/2018 (cg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(gec) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Election not to Mediate

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Joseph P. Farina. Mediation Hearing set for 5/16/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 4/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 3/8/19 before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres, 1-35 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2019. (hh) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Compliance With Order of Referral to Mediation by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. re #18 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Order Granting Motion to Withdraw granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz and Michael D Dunlavy withdrawn from case Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Vanessa Diaz. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of record by Vanessa E. Diaz for / by Jose D. Estrada. Responses due by 4/2/2019 (Nelson, Nathan) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STATUS REPORT JOINT INTERIM STATUS REPORT by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • (#20) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: A discovery Hearing has been set for March 8, 2019 at 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres in the Miami Division, United States Courthouse, James Lawrence King Bldg., Courtroom 5 - Tenth Floor, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida. As requested by the parties, the hearing will be set for a discovery dispute pertaining to the above-listed case, in addition to several other associated cases where the same discovery issues have arisen. The parties must provide any source materials to the Court by Monday, March 4, 2019 at 5:00 PM. (abu) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D Dunlavy on behalf of Jose D. Estrada. Attorney Michael D Dunlavy added to party Jose D. Estrada(pty:pla). (Dunlavy, Michael) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 11/12/2019 in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr., Calendar Call set for 11/5/2019 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/28/2019.) Deadline to join additional parties or amend pleadings 1/8/2019; Deadline to file joint interim status report, 3/12/2019; Deadline to complete fact discovery 4/30/2019; Deadline for Consent to Jurisdiction before the designated Magistrate Judge for final disposition, 6/4/2019; Deadline to complete expert discovery, 6/28/2019; Deadline for the filing of all dispositive and Daubert motions, 7/24/2019; Deadline for the filing of other pretrial motions, including motions in limine, 9/17/2019; Deadline to file joint pretrial stipulation, 10/15/2019; Deadline to file proposed jury instructions, 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/3/2018. See attached document for full details. (mno) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McLoone, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Catherine Pyune McEldowney, mailing date October 23, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kevin Michael Hodges, mailing date October 23, 2018, (pt) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • (#8) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-06098. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb). (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/23/2018.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATEMENT regarding Venue by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. , and Plaintiff, Jose Estrada (Haycraft, Don) Modified on 10/18/2018 (cg). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(gec) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6954747) filed by Jose D Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Election not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Jose D Estrada(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.