This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:17 (UTC).

Estrada v. Bexar County Texas et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Estrada filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Bexar County Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard B. Farrer and Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard B. Farrer

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Anthony Estrada

San Antonio, TX 78207

Defendants

Donna Kay McKinney

Anita Limon

Bexar County Texas

Sheriff FNU Joaquine

Officer FNU Maldonado

Aisling Morales

Child Protective Services

Alicia Vela

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Copy of Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Anthony Estrada.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Mark Anthony Estrada. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Mark Anthony Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(fs) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT, Copy routed to Operations Department. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) JUDGMENT, Copy routed to Operations Department. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Copy routed to Operations Department. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Mark Anthony Estrada. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (aej) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Anthony Estrada.. Motions referred to Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Mark Anthony Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Copy of Envelope)(fs) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Richard B. Farrer. (fs) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • THIS CASE HAS BEEN RANDOMLY ASSIGNED TO XAVIER RODRIGUEZ. (fs) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less