This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2018 at 07:34:42 (UTC).

Estate of Nicholas A. Pimentel, et al. v. City of Ceres, et al.

Case Summary

On 09/05/2018 Estate of Nicholas A Pimentel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Ceres. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale A. Drozd and Erica P. Grosjean. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01203

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale A. Drozd

Referral Judge

Erica P. Grosjean

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Estate of Nicholas A. Pimentel

Derek Pimentel

Estate of Diane L. Pimentel

Travis Pimentel

Matthew Pimentel

Maria Pilar Rivera

A. D. P.

Summer Pimentel

Defendants

Ross Bays

Brent Smith

City of Ceres

Ceres Police Department

Darren Venn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark E. Merin

Attorney at Law Office of Mark E. Merin

1010 F Street, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95814

Paul Hajime Masuhara, III

Attorney at Law Office of Mark E. Merin

1010 F Street, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95814

Andrew Peter Rausch, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of A. Peter Rausch, Jr.

1930 Tienda Drive, Suite 106

Lodi, CA 95242

Defendant Attorney

Bruce Daniel Praet

Attorney at Ferguson Praet and Sherman

1631 E 18Th Street

Santa Ana, CA 92705-7101

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn.(Praet, Bruce) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#11

(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn. Attorney Praet, Bruce Daniel added.(Praet, Bruce) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ross Bays served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Darren Venn served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brent Smith served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ceres Police Department served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Ceres served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/17/2018. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

4 #3

VDRP

4 #2

Consent Form

4 #1

Standing Order

#4

(#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Andrew Peter Rausch, Jr.* *Law Offices of A. Peter Rausch, Jr.* *1930 Tienda Drive, Suite 106* *Lodi, CA 95242*. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

2 #2

Proposed Order

2 #1

Declaration of Summer Pimentel

#2

(#2) MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by A. D. P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Summer Pimentel, #2 Proposed Order)(Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

1 #3

Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 377.32 Declaration re Diane L. Pimentel

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn by Travis Pimentel, Matthew Pimentel, Estate of Diane L. Pimentel, Summer Pimentel, Estate of Nicholas A. Pimentel, Maria Pilar Rivera, Derek Pimentel, A. D. P.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7849390) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 377.32 Declaration re Nicholas A. Pimentel, #3 Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 377.32 Declaration re Diane L. Pimentel)(Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn.(Praet, Bruce) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn. Attorney Praet, Bruce Daniel added.(Praet, Bruce) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ross Bays served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Darren Venn served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Brent Smith served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ceres Police Department served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Ceres served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/17/2018. (Thorp, J) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Andrew Peter Rausch, Jr.* *Law Offices of A. Peter Rausch, Jr.* *1930 Tienda Drive, Suite 106* *Lodi, CA 95242*. (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by A. D. P.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Summer Pimentel, #2 Proposed Order)(Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ross Bays, Ceres Police Department, City of Ceres, Brent Smith, Darren Venn by Travis Pimentel, Matthew Pimentel, Estate of Diane L. Pimentel, Summer Pimentel, Estate of Nicholas A. Pimentel, Maria Pilar Rivera, Derek Pimentel, A. D. P.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7849390) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 377.32 Declaration re Nicholas A. Pimentel, #3 Cal. Code Civ. Proc. 377.32 Declaration re Diane L. Pimentel)(Merin, Mark) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.