This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:56:14 (UTC).

Estate of Ke Zhengguang v. Stephany

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Estate of Ke Zhengguang filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Stephany. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy J. Sullivan and Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-03546

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Timothy J. Sullivan

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Estate of Ke Zhengguang

Defendant

Yu Naifen Stephany

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Steven Abram Cash

Attorney at Day Pitney, LLP

1100 New York Avenue, N.W., Suite 300

Washington, DC 20818

Lars H Liebeler

Attorney at Lars Liebeler, PC

1828 L Street, Nw, Suite 705

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Charles Michael

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Michael J Baratz

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

1330 Connecticut Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER Granting #25 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Yu Naifen Stephany answer due 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/11/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#27

(#27) Correspondence re: Request, under Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions (ECF No. 20), for Leave to Move to Dismiss (Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#25

(#25) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on Consent by Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Cash, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#22

(#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant/Respondent to Respond to Petition by Yu Naifen Stephany (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles Michael (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7738862.) by Yu Naifen Stephany(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#20

(#20) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/17/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

(#6) Summons Issued 21 days as to Yu Naifen Stephany. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Estate of Ke Zhengguang re #1 Complaint, Summons (Liebeler, Lars) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-D

#1

(#25) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on Consent by Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Cash, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • (#29) PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING pre-motion telephone conference call on January 24, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. AND DIRECTING Respondent's counsel to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/14/2019. (sb2, Chambers) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER Granting #25 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Yu Naifen Stephany answer due 2/15/2019. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/11/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Correspondence re: Request, under Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions (ECF No. 20), for Leave to Move to Dismiss (Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) QC NOTICE: #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang was filed incorrectly. **A motion and proposed order must be filed separately. The motion should be filed as the main document and proposed order as separate attachments to the main document. Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on Consent by Estate of Ke Zhengguang (Cash, Steven) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charles Michael. Directing attorney Charles Michael to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time as follows: Defendant's answer or motion in response to Plaintiff's petition is now due 1/11/19. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/19/2018. (sb2s, Chambers) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant/Respondent to Respond to Petition by Yu Naifen Stephany (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles Michael (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7738862.) by Yu Naifen Stephany(Baratz, Michael) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/17/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) QC NOTICE: #9 Affidavit of Service filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang was filed incorrectly. **Refile using the Civil event - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Petition served on Yu Naifen Stephany on 12/02/2018, filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang.(Liebeler, Lars) Modified on 12/6/2018 (km4s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY as to Estate of Ke Zhengguang re: #7 Notice (Other). Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Estate of Ke Zhengguang Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (Liebeler, Lars) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued 21 days as to Yu Naifen Stephany. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Estate of Ke Zhengguang re #1 Complaint, Summons (Liebeler, Lars) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 11/19/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Estate of Ke Zhengguang, Yu Naifen Stephany or counsel for Estate of Ke Zhengguang, Yu Naifen Stephany are directed to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 12/3/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT To Recognize / Enforce Foreign Arbitration Award against Estate of Ke Zhengguang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7677851.), filed by Estate of Ke Zhengguang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebeler, Lars) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less