This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/23/2018 at 07:41:23 (UTC).

E.S.R.B. et al v. Sessions III et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2018 E S R B filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sessions III. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dana M. Sabraw and Mitchell D. Dembin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01699

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana M. Sabraw

Referral Judge

Mitchell D. Dembin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J.E.C.M.

K.C.A.

F.E.O.G.

K.D.G.

S.G.G.

I.M.Q.S.

E.S.R.B.

Defendants

Director L. Francis Cissna

U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Customs and Border Protection

Jefferson B. Sessions III

Scott Lloyd

Kirstjen Nielsen

U.S. Department of Health and Human Services

Ronald D Vitiello

Alex Azar

Office of Refugee Resettlement

Kevin K. McAleenan

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Alan Rosenberg

Attorney at The Legal Aid Society (Civil Div. NYC)

199 Water Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Judith A. Goldiner

Attorney at The Legal Aid Society (Civil Div. NYC)

199 Water Street, 3Rd Floor

New York, NY 10038

Adriene L. Holder

Attorney at The Legal Aid Society

90 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole N. Murley

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Sarah B. Fabian

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P. O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2018
  • Docket(#6) Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from Southern District of New York. (no document attached) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jpp) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06654. Original file with documents numbered 1-2, received electronically (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of California (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: This motion comes before the undersigned, sitting in Part I, because of the request for emergency relief. For the reasons stated from the bench, see Transcript, 7/29/18, which are here incorporated by reference, the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California, as further set forth in this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer immediately, notwithstanding Local Rule 83.1, and then to close the case in this Court. (Signed by Part 1 Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/24/2018) (cf) Modified on 7/25/2018 (cf). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/25/2018) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT & PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Department Of Homeland Security, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Office of Refugee Resettlement, Jefferson B. Sessions III, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Ronald D. Vitiello. Document filed by F.E.O.G., J.E.C.M., E.S.R.B., S.G.G., R.M.S.C., K.C.A., I.M.Q.S., K.M.G., K.D.G..(pc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/26/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K.D.G., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Customs and Border Protection is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant