This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2019 at 00:27:48 (UTC).

Jimmy Esebag v. Justin Whaley et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 Jimmy Esebag filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Justin Whaley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08446

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Jimmy Esebag

Los Angeles, CA 90067

United Licensing Group Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Rodney Redman

Does 1-20

Ron Whaley

Justin Whaley

Tom Maddi

M. Sean Hatch

Michael Bahn

Jodie Daniels

Sean Hatch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Eric Carl Lauritsen

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Peter W Ross

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christopher Kolkey

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey C Berman

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Noah S Helpern

Attorney at Browne George Ross LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Chad W Pekron

111 Center Street Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

E B Chiles, IV

Attorney at Quattlebaum Grooms and Tull PLLC

111 Center Street Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Robert Ryan Younger

111 Center Street Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201

Garrett Scott Llewellyn

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kevin D Rising

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3010

 

Court Documents

#122

121 #1

Proposed Order

#121

#120

119 #6

Exhibit B - Depositin Exhibit 81

#110

103 #2

Proposed Order

103 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#103

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action

#1

270 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#122) DECLARATION of Noah S. Helpern In Support Of APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Decl. of Chad Pekron ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #110 / Designating Partys Declaration In Support Of Application To File Under Seal Pursuant To Protective Order] filed by Counter Defendant Jimmy Esebag, Plaintiff Jimmy Esebag. (Helpern, Noah) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#121) Notice of Withdrawal of Notice (Other), #103 filed by Defendants Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, M. Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rising, Kevin) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#120) MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff and Cross-Defendants Jimmy Esebag, Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group Inc. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#119) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Defendants' Counerclaims filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendants Jimmy Esebag, Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group Inc. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Conclusions of Law ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration Jimmy Esebag ISO Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Peter W. Ross Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit A - Deposition Exhibit 49, #6 Exhibit B - Depositin Exhibit 81, #7 Exhibit C - Deposition Excerpts of M. Sean Hatch, #8 Exhibit D- Deposition Excerpts of Ron Whaley, #9 Exhibit E - Deposition Excerpts of Jodie Daniels, #10 Exhibit F- Deposition Excerpts of Tom Maddi, #11 Exhibit G - Deposition Excerpts of Michael Bahn, #12 Exhibit H- Deposition Excerpts Todney Redman, #13 Exhibit I - Deposition Excerpts of Justin Whaley, #14 Exhibit J - Deposition Exhibit 25, #15 Exhibit K - Deposition Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit L - Deposition Exhibit 45, #17 Exhibit M - Deposition Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit N - Deposition Exhibit 32, #19 Exhibit O - Deposition Exhibit 47, #20 Exhibit P - Deposition Exhibit 60, #21 Exhibit Q - Deposition Exhibit 71, #22 Exhibit R - Deposition Exhibit 99, #23 Exhibit S - Depsition Exhibit 104, #24 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eric Carl Lauritsen added to party United Licensing Group Inc(pty:cd)) (Lauritsen, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#118) Exhibit List (JOINT EXHIBIT LIST) filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Jimmy Esebag, Jimmy Esebag.. (Helpern, Noah) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#117) MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, Does, M. Sean Hatch, Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. (Llewellyn, Garrett) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#116) Witness List filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant (JOINT WITNESS LIST) Jimmy Esebag, Jimmy Esebag.. (Helpern, Noah) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#115) NOTICE OF LODGING filed [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Application to File Under Seal re APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Decl. of Chad Pekron ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #110 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Garrett) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#114) SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits to Decl. of Chad Pekron ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal #110 filed by Defendants Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, Does, M. Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley, Counter Claimants Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 2 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 3 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 4 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 5 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 6 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 14 Part 1 of 2 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 14 Part 2 of 2 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 29 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 30 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 31 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 48 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit 49 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 136 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #15 Exhibit 153 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 158 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEA, #17 Exhibit 183 - UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL)(Llewellyn, Garrett) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#113) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Complaint and on Count III of their Counterclaim against Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Jimmy Esebag filed by Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, Does, M. Sean Hatch, Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Chad W. Pekron ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Declaration of Jodie Daniels ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Declaration of Justin Whaley ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #5 Declaration of Michael Bahn ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #6 Declaration of Rodney Redman ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #7 Declaration of Ron Whaley ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #8 Declaration of M. Sean Hatch ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #9 Declaration of Tom Maddi ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #10 Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #11 Proposed Judgment) (Llewellyn, Garrett) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DECLARATION of Gabrielle J. Anderson-Thompson Regarding Unsealing of Complaint filed by Defendant Michael Bahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gabrielle J. Anderson-Thompson Regarding Unsealing of Complaint)(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 16-05 (identical case) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-08446 R(RAOx). (rn) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Michael Bahn, of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on October 1, 2018. (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): It was discovered that Attachment 2 Exhibit 2 to the Notice of Removal is a Sealed Complaint. The Case Opening clerk has now sealed the attached complaint. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SEALED CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT Sealed Complaint Filed in State Court submitted as Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 . (car) Modified on 10/3/2018 (car). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Michael Bahn, identifying Jimmy Esebag, Justin Whaley, Rodney Redman, Ron Whaley, M. Sean Hatch, Jodie Daniels, Tom Maddi and Non-Party United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Michael Bahn. (Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - West District, case number SC128676 Receipt No: 0973-22509861 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Michael Bahn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Gabrielle Jaynea Anderson-Thompson added to party Michael Bahn(pty:dft))(Anderson-Thompson, Gabrielle) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Licensing Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Carl Lauritsen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Miles Kolkey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noah S Helpern