This case was last updated from PACER on 06/17/2019 at 04:40:04 (UTC).

Errico v. SSA

Case Summary

On 03/15/2018 Errico filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SSA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Samuel Errico, II

Defendant

Commissioner of SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald C. Cox

Attorney at Ronald C. Cox Attorney At Law, PSC

207 E. Central Street

Harlan, KY 40831

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas Allen Fletcher

Attorney at Social Security Administration - Denver

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

Cheryl D. Morgan

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office, EDKY

260 W. Vine Street, Suite 300

Lexington, KY 40507-1612

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) JUDGMENT : 1. The final administrative decision of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, is AFFIRMED. 2. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Berryhill with respect to all issues raised in this civil action. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/5/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#18

(#18) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1. Defendant Acting Commissioner of Social Security Nancy A. Berryhill's Motion for Summary Judgment [Record No. #17 ] is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff Samuel Errico's Motion for Summary Judgment [Record No. #15 ] is DENIED. 3. The administrative decision will be AFFIRMED by separate Judgment entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/5/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: 1. Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 90 days; 3. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause (SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 06/21/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of SSA : defendant's motion [Record No. 9] is GRANTED. The Commissioner shall have an additional 31 days to file the Answer and Certified Administrative Transcript or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/18/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 05/18/2018)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER: 1. granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. The plaintiff may proceed herein without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/16/18. (SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) JUDGMENT : 1. The final administrative decision of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, is AFFIRMED. 2. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Berryhill with respect to all issues raised in this civil action. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/5/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1. Defendant Acting Commissioner of Social Security Nancy A. Berryhill's Motion for Summary Judgment [Record No. #17 ] is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiff Samuel Errico's Motion for Summary Judgment [Record No. #15 ] is DENIED. 3. The administrative decision will be AFFIRMED by separate Judgment entered this date. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/5/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Note re #11 Answer to Complaint; A copy of the administrative record was received by the clerk's office and forwarded to chambers. (JJ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***CROSS-MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Samuel Errico, II , #17 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of SSA with Supporting Memorandum (MRS) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of SSA with Supporting Memorandum (Fletcher, Douglas) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Fletcher, Douglas) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Samuel Errico, II (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Ronald) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) VIRTUAL ORDER re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time by Samuel Errico, II : granting MOTION for Extension of Time by Samuel Errico, II. The time within which the plaintiff may file his motion for summary judgment is extended by 20 days. Likewise, the time within which the defendant may file a motion for summary judgment is extended by 20 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/18/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Extension of Time by Samuel Errico, II (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Ronald) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE and SOCIAL SECURITY CASE BRIEFING SCHEDULE STANDING ORDER: 1. Plaintiff move for summary judgment within 60 days; 2. Secretary file response w/in 90 days; 3. extensions may be granted only upon showing of good cause (SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER re #9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of SSA : defendant's motion [Record No. 9] is GRANTED. The Commissioner shall have an additional 31 days to file the Answer and Certified Administrative Transcript or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/18/18.(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time by Commissioner of SSA TO FILE ANSWER AND CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morgan, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl) (Entered: 04/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (USM 285 Form) Returned Executed by Samuel Errico, II via certified mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 3/26/2018. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via certified mail on 3/26/18; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via certified mail on 3/29/18. (SYD) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service (SYD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2018: #1 USM Receipt stamped 3/16/2018) (KJA). (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: 1. granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. 2. The plaintiff may proceed herein without the payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/16/18. (SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review: re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Errico, II (SYD) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (SYD) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT filed by Samuel Errico, II. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 USM 285 Form, #3 Summons US Atty General, #4 Summons SSA, #5 Summons US Atty)(SYD) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Errico, II.(SYD) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less