This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 08:25:28 (UTC).

ERICKSON v. HARWOOD

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 ERICKSON filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against HARWOOD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy L. Waldor and Claire C. Cecchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12881

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYNTHIA ERICKSON

Newark, NJ 07104

Defendant

BERNITA MIMS HARWOOD

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES; Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees is DENIED, for the following reasons: Plaintiff shows substantial income, such that she is capable of paying the filing fee; the Clerk is ordered to close the file. Plaintiff(s) may submit payment in the amount of $400 within 14 days from the date of this order to reopen the case without further action from the Court. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/03/2018. (sms) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #3

Text of Proposed Order

1 #2

Application IFP

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(fp, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER ON APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES; Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees is DENIED, for the following reasons: Plaintiff shows substantial income, such that she is capable of paying the filing fee; the Clerk is ordered to close the file. Plaintiff(s) may submit payment in the amount of $400 within 14 days from the date of this order to reopen the case without further action from the Court. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/03/2018. (sms) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(fp, ) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less