This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:53:49 (UTC).

Eric Thomas v. Scott Kernan et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Eric Thomas filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Scott Kernan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-02099

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Thomas

Hemet, CA 92544

Defendants

Dean Borderrs

D. O Neil

Debra M. Cornez

Scott Kernan

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Consent CV-11

#7

(#7) ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Plaintiff Eric Thomas. (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS TO COURT CLERK FOR FORWARDING TO UNITED STATES MARSHAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Thomas. (clee) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Eric Thomas. (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Dean Borderrs, Debra M. Cornez, Scott Kernan, D. O Neil pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, filed by plaintiff Eric Thomas. (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent CV-11) (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Scott Kernan, Debra M. Cornez, Dean Borders, D.O'Neil. (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • (#11) Text Only Entry. Four (4) USM-285s, Summons, and Complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service of process. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS TO COURT CLERK FOR FORWARDING TO UNITED STATES MARSHAL filed by Plaintiff Eric Thomas. (clee) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendants Scott Kernan, Debra M. Cornez, Dean Borders, D.O'Neil. (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN CIVIL RIGHTS CASES by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Consent CV-11) (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Change of address Filed by Plaintiff Eric Thomas. (clee) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Eric Thomas. (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Dean Borderrs, Debra M. Cornez, Scott Kernan, D. O Neil pursuant to 42 USC 1983pr. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, filed by plaintiff Eric Thomas. (esa) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.