This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2018 at 07:22:34 (UTC).

EQUIPPED LLC v. DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 EQUIPPED LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley R. Chesler and Cathy L. Waldor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12394

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley R. Chesler

Referral Judge

Cathy L. Waldor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUIPPED LLC

Defendants

JOHN/JANE DOES 1-10

DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

Interested Party

Power Play Marketing Group, LLC

1300 Mendota Heights Rd.

Mendota, MN 55120

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN P. CAMPBELL

Attorney at SCHENCK PRICE SMITH & KING, LLP

220 Park Avenue, Po Box 901

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Defendant Attorney

DAVID J. RUBENSTEIN

Attorney at RUBENSTEIN BUSINESS LAW

250 Pehle Ave., Suite 200

Saddle Brook, NJ 07663

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Power Play Marketing Group, LLC re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WATKINS, CASEY) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Certification Certification

#6

(#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

5 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#5

(#5) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. (RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

#3

(#3) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC.(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. CAMPBELL on behalf of Equipped LLC (CAMPBELL, JOHN) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

1 #3

Certification Cert of Service

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dialectic Distribution, LLC from New Jersey Superior Court, case number L-3186-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8927928), filed by Dialectic Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certification Cert of Service)(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Withdraw Motion (RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Power Play Marketing Group, LLC re #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WATKINS, CASEY) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor by telephone on 10/19/18 at 10am. Plaintiff shall initiate the call and local counsel for any/all parties must participate. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference.. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/4/18. (tjg, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motion set for 10/1/2018 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC. (RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION, LLC.(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 09/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. CAMPBELL on behalf of Equipped LLC (CAMPBELL, JOHN) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dialectic Distribution, LLC from New Jersey Superior Court, case number L-3186-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8927928), filed by Dialectic Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Certification Cert of Service)(RUBENSTEIN, DAVID) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIALECTIC DISTRIBUTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant