This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/25/2018 at 07:44:12 (UTC).

EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION v. MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGH LAWSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUGH LAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION

Intervenor Plaintiffs

BREANNA CALDWELL

CRYSTAL VINSON

Defendant

MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES W ALLEN

Attorney at EEOC

7391 Hodgson Mem Dr Ste 200

Savannah, GA 31406

Intervenor Plaintiff Attorneys

ELLEN L SCHOOLAR

7 Oglethorpe Prof Blvd Ste 1

Savannah, GA 31406

ALAN STEWART LOWE

7 Oglethorpe Prof Bldg Ste 1

Savannah, GA 31406

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Complaint of Intervenors

#5

5 #1

Proposed Complaint of Intervenors

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CRYSTAL VINSON, BREANNA CALDWELL. as to MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (SCHOOLAR, ELLEN) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ALAN STEWART LOWE on behalf of BREANNA CALDWELL, CRYSTAL VINSON Attorney ALAN STEWART LOWE added to party BREANNA CALDWELL(pty:intvp), Attorney ALAN STEWART LOWE added to party CRYSTAL VINSON(pty:intvp) (LOWE, ALAN) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Intervenor COMPLAINT against MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION. (rlw) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Intervene. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 10/26/2018. (aks) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION re #5 MOTION to Intervene (ALLEN, JAMES) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Intervene by BREANNA CALDWELL, CRYSTAL VINSON filed by ELLEN L SCHOOLAR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint of Intervenors)(SCHOOLAR, ELLEN) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #4 Motion to Intervene filed by BREANNA CALDWELL, CRYSTAL VINSON ); Document must be converted into text-searchable PDF format and refiled. (rlw) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Intervene by Breanna Caldwell, Crystal Vinson filed by ELLEN L SCHOOLAR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint of Intervenors)(SCHOOLAR, ELLEN) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. as to MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (ALLEN, JAMES) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (rlw) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (IFP) against MEDIACOM COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION, A NEW YORK CORPORATION filed by EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ALLEN, JAMES) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediacom Communications Corporation is a litigant