This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Epperson v. Hart

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Epperson filed a Prisoner - Death Penalty lawsuit against Hart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Simpson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Death Penalty

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Simpson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Roger Epperson

Defendant and Respondent

DeEdra Hart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

David M. Barron

Attorney at Kentucky Department of Public Advocacy - Frankfort

5 Mill Creek Park, Section 101

Frankfort, KY 40601

Brian M. Pomerantz

P.O. Box 853

Carrboro, NC 27510

Respondent Attorney

Jason B. Moore

Attorney at Kentucky Attorney General

1024 Capital Center Drive, Suite 200

Frankfort, KY 40601-8204

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/20/2018. The Court hereby adopts for the pre-filing stage of the habeas petition that Roger Epperson's attorney submitted attached to the motion to adopt the proposed budget.cc:counsel; Brian Pomerantz (JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 9/20/2018 (JWM). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/18/2018 granting #12 Motion to Stay. Epperson shall file his state court action within 30 days. A status report on the progress of the state court proceedings shall be filed every 90 days, and inform this Court within 14 days of final state court ruling. cc: Counsel; Brian Pomertanz(JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 9/19/2018 (JWM). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

12 #1

Proposed Order granting motion to hold federal habeas proceedings in abeyance wh

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus unopposed motion to stay and abey federal habeas proceedings while Epperson returns to state court by Petitioner Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting motion to hold federal habeas proceedings in abeyance while Epperson returns to state court) (Barron, David) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

9 #1

Epperson's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus

#9

(#9) NOTICE of filing of Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Habeas Petition attached to notice) by Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Epperson's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (Barron, David) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Moore on behalf of DeEdra Hart (Moore, Jason) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/9/2018 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Brian M. Pomerantz for Roger Epperson. Counsel shall consult with Robert J. Ranz, Sixth Circuit CJA Budgeting Attorney, and formulate a proposed budget for reasonable compensation, costs and expenses anticipated to be incurred in the case. A proposed budget for the preliminary phase of the case shall be filed ex parte with the court for approval within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order. A complete proposed budget shall be filed ex parte with the court for approval within thirty (30) days of the filing of the habeas corpus petition. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel, Petitioner Roger Epperson, David M. Barron, Brian M. Pomerantz, Jason B. Moore, Robert J. Ranz (MEJ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#5

(#5) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Roger Epperson. Responses due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roger Epperson. Responses due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Intent to file Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Roger Epperson. (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/20/2018. The Court hereby adopts for the pre-filing stage of the habeas petition that Roger Epperson's attorney submitted attached to the motion to adopt the proposed budget.cc:counsel; Brian Pomerantz (JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 9/20/2018 (JWM). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/18/2018 granting #12 Motion to Stay. Epperson shall file his state court action within 30 days. A status report on the progress of the state court proceedings shall be filed every 90 days, and inform this Court within 14 days of final state court ruling. cc: Counsel; Brian Pomertanz(JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 9/19/2018 (JWM). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus unopposed motion to stay and abey federal habeas proceedings while Epperson returns to state court by Petitioner Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting motion to hold federal habeas proceedings in abeyance while Epperson returns to state court) (Barron, David) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EX PARTE MOTION by Petitioner Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Barron declaration, #2 Pomerantz declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Barron, David) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Capital Case) By a Person in State Custody and Consolidated Memorandum of Law, filed by Roger Epperson. (See Notice of Filing at DN #9 .) (CDF) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of filing of Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Habeas Petition attached to notice) by Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Epperson's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (Barron, David) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number L33056713 re DN #6 by Roger Epperson. (JSS) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Remark - #6 re-sent to Epperson at the full address for the Kentucky State Penitentiary. (RLK) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Moore on behalf of DeEdra Hart (Moore, Jason) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Roger Epperson. Envelope states Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, and Unable to Forward. (MEJ) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/9/2018 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Brian M. Pomerantz for Roger Epperson. Counsel shall consult with Robert J. Ranz, Sixth Circuit CJA Budgeting Attorney, and formulate a proposed budget for reasonable compensation, costs and expenses anticipated to be incurred in the case. A proposed budget for the preliminary phase of the case shall be filed ex parte with the court for approval within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order. A complete proposed budget shall be filed ex parte with the court for approval within thirty (30) days of the filing of the habeas corpus petition. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel, Petitioner Roger Epperson, David M. Barron, Brian M. Pomerantz, Jason B. Moore, Robert J. Ranz (MEJ) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Roger Epperson. Responses due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roger Epperson. (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roger Epperson. Responses due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Intent to file Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Roger Epperson. (KD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less