This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2018 at 07:15:03 (UTC).

Epic Brewing Co., LLC v. Eddyline Brewing LLC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2017 Epic Brewing Co , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Eddyline Brewing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Y. Wang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-02637

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Y. Wang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Epic Brewing Co., LLC

Defendant

Eddyline Brewing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carey Matthew Rozier

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, LLP-Denver

1200 17Th Street, One Tabor Center, Suite 1900

Denver, CO 80202

Peter Ryan Montecuollo

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer, LLP-Phoenix

400 East Van Buren, One Arizona Center, Suite 1900

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Defendant Attorney

Derek Edward Long

Attorney at Drumm Law, LLC

14656 West 56Th Drive

Arvada, CO 80002

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STIPULATION Stipulated Proposed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Plaintiff Epic Brewing Co., LLC. (Rozier, Carey) Modified on 1/22/2018 to show as a motion pursuant to direction from the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wang. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/5/2018. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#15

(#15) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff shall supplement the Scheduling Order with a good faith estimate of the computation of damages on or before January 26, 2018. Fact discovery cut-off: July 23, 2018.Expert discovery cut-off: September 24, 2018. Dispositive motion deadline: August 28, 2018. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for January 10, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang in Courtroom C-204. The parties shall electronically file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in a Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Peter R. Montecuollo by Peter Ryan Montecuollo on behalf of Epic Brewing Co., LLCAttorney Peter Ryan Montecuollo added to party Epic Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (Montecuollo, Peter) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

#13

(#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Epic Brewing Co., LLC. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Eddyline Brewing, LLC.(Long, Derek) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Epic Brewing Co., LLC All parties consent.. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Socorro Springs Brewing Co. for Eddyline Brewing, LLC. (Long, Derek) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Edward Long on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Derek Edward Long added to party Eddyline Brewing, LLC(pty:dft) (Long, Derek) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/13/17. A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/5/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 12/29/2017. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 12/22/2017. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Epic Brewing Co., LLC. Eddyline Brewing, LLC waiver sent on 11/3/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eddyline Brewing LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5791150)Attorney Carey Matthew Rozier added to party Epic Brewing Co LLC(pty:pla), filed by Epic Brewing Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION Stipulated Proposed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Plaintiff Epic Brewing Co., LLC. (Rozier, Carey) Modified on 1/22/2018 to show as a motion pursuant to direction from the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wang. (nmarb, ). (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2018 pursuant to #15 Courtroom Minutes. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/5/2018. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 1/5/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff shall supplement the Scheduling Order with a good faith estimate of the computation of damages on or before January 26, 2018. Fact discovery cut-off: July 23, 2018.Expert discovery cut-off: September 24, 2018. Dispositive motion deadline: August 28, 2018. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for January 10, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang in Courtroom C-204. The parties shall electronically file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in a Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom C-204. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Peter R. Montecuollo by Peter Ryan Montecuollo on behalf of Epic Brewing Co., LLCAttorney Peter Ryan Montecuollo added to party Epic Brewing Co., LLC(pty:pla) (Montecuollo, Peter) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Epic Brewing Co., LLC. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Eddyline Brewing, LLC.(Long, Derek) (Entered: 12/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Pursuant to the parties' consent #10 and 28 USC 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Wang to fully preside over for all purposes. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/27/17. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Epic Brewing Co., LLC All parties consent.. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Socorro Springs Brewing Co. for Eddyline Brewing, LLC. (Long, Derek) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Edward Long on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Derek Edward Long added to party Eddyline Brewing, LLC(pty:dft) (Long, Derek) (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/13/17. A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/5/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed order in Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 12/29/2017. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 12/22/2017. (bwilk, ) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Epic Brewing Co., LLC. Eddyline Brewing, LLC waiver sent on 11/3/2017, answer due 1/2/2018. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 11/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Eddyline Brewing LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5791150)Attorney Carey Matthew Rozier added to party Epic Brewing Co LLC(pty:pla), filed by Epic Brewing Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rozier, Carey) (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less