This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 13:19:53 (UTC).

Environmental Remediation Consultants, Inc. v. R.L.R. Investments, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2018 Environmental Remediation Consultants, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R L R Investments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00314

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Environmental Remediation Consultants, Inc.

Defendants

RLR Shared Services, LLC

Gator Freightways, Inc.

R.L.R. Investments, LLC

Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.

Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. doing business as R+L Carriers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Patrick Stapleton

Attorney at J. Patrick Stapleton, PC

P.O. Box 4428

Sevierville, TN 37864

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory C Logue

Attorney at Woolf, McClane, Bright, Allen & Carpenter, PLLC

P O Box 900, 900 S. Gay Street

Knoxville, TN 37901

Anthony C White

Attorney at Thompson Hine LLP

41 South High Street, Suite 1700

Columbus, OH 43215

Stephanie M Chmiel

Attorney at Thompson Hine LLP

41 South High Street, Suite 1700

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony White (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3037089) by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#39

(#39) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie Chmiel (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3037089) by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

26 #8

Other Civil Cover Sheet

26 #7

Summons

26 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 6

26 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 5

26 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

26 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

26 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

#4

(#4) Certificate of Corporate Interest by R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gator Freightways, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Florida Transfer & Freight, Inc. for Gator Freightways, Inc.. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by RLR Shared Services, LLC. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #4

Exhibit Written Notice to Adverse Parties

1 #3

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#8) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER granting #39 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 1/7/2019. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) Modified to reflect copy mailed to Stephanie M Chmiel on 1/8/2019 (JBR). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by R.L.R. Investments, LLC, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., #40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by R.L.R. Investments, LLC, Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. (JBR) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anthony White (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3037089) by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephanie Chmiel (Filing fee $90.00, Receipt #K3037089) by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (JBR) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.'s ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint, by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc..(Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 11/14/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Environmental Remediation Consultants, Inc.. (Stapleton, J.) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) R.L.R. Investments, LLC's ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint, by R.L.R. Investments, LLC.(Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent R&L Carriers, Inc. for Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2018 at 11:30 AM in Video Conference Room in Knoxville, Tennessee, before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 08/07/2018. (JWF) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, of Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/1/18. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (GRE, ) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Corporate Interest by R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Gator Freightways, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Florida Transfer & Freight, Inc. for Gator Freightways, Inc.. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by RLR Shared Services, LLC. (Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Knox County Chancery Court, case number 196210-3. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3731723), filed by RLR Shared Services, LLC, Gator Freightways, Inc., R.L.R. Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Written Notice to Adverse Parties, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Logue, Gregory) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less