This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2019 at 07:14:28 (UTC).

Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company et al v. Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-08399

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ENDURANCE AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

XL Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

GPL SERVICING, LTD.

VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC

GPL SERVICING AGENT, LLC

Victory Park Management, LLC

VPC/TF TRUST I

GPL SERVICING TRUST II

GPL SERVICING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Edwin Pepping

Attorney at Chasnoff Mungia Pepping & Stribling, PLLC

1020 Ne Loop 410, Suite 150

San Antonio, TX 78209

John H. Scheid

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer

1 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Manuel Mungia

Attorney at Chasnoff Mungia Pepping & Stribling, PLLC

1020 Ne Loop 410, Suite 150

San Antonio, TX 78209

James Joseph Sipchen

Attorney at Pretzel & Stouffer, Chtd.

One South Wacker Drive, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606-4673

Charles C. Nwabueze

Attorney at Chasnoff Mungia Pepping

1020 N.E. Loop 410, Suite 150

San Antonio, TX 78209

Leslie S. Ahari

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

1775 Pennsylvania Ave, Nw, 4Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

David F Cutter

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

3000, 55 West Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Emily A Golding

Attorney at Clyde & Co Us LLP

55 West Monroe Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant Attorneys

William Timothy Pruitt

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Kent Jacob Hayden

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Justin Ryan Bernbrock

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis Llp

300 N Lasalle, Office 3606

Chicago, IL 60654

Ryan Blaine Bennett

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

45 #9

Exhibit Ex. 8 - Brice v. Rees Transfer Order

45 #8

Exhibit Ex. 7 - Gibbs v. Haynes Investments Order

45 #7

Exhibit Ex. 6 - Banks v. Rees Transfer Order

45 #6

Exhibit Ex. 5 - Gibbs v. Rees Transfer Order

45 #5

Exhibit Ex. 4 - Exclusivity Period Order

45 #4

Exhibit Ex. 3 - AAA

45 #3

Exhibit Ex. 2 - GSA

45 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1 - VPCA Claim No. 1156 in TF Bankr

45 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Golding Declaration ISO Motion to Remand

2 #5

Exhibit Exhibit F

2 #4

Exhibit Exhibit E

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit D

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit C

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit B

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit List

#1

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Plaintiff's unopposed motion #41 to seal is granted. The Court will re-evaluate the propriety of sealing when considering the underlying motions. Motion number #40 is terminated as superseded by #45 . Motion number #45 is terminated because it is simply the public version of motion #43 . Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) RESPONSE by GPL Servicing Agent, LLC, GPL Servicing Trust, GPL Servicing Trust II, GPL Servicing, LTD., VPC/TF Trust I, Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company to remand CORRECTED-REDACTED Motion re Doc. 40 #45 - Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Cross-Motion to Transfer (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) Amended NOTICE of Motion by John H. Scheid for presentment of motion to seal #41 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/14/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) MOTION by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company to remand CORRECTED-REDACTED Motion re Doc. 40 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Golding Declaration ISO Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - VPCA Claim No. 1156 in TF Bankr, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - GSA, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - AAA, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Exclusivity Period Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Gibbs v. Rees Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Banks v. Rees Transfer Order, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - Gibbs v. Haynes Investments Order, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - Brice v. Rees Transfer Order, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Granger v. Great Plains, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Gingras v. Victory Park Docket, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Penn AG v. Think Finance Order Denying Transfer, #13 Exhibit Ex. 12 - CFPB v. Think Finance Order Denying Mot. to Change Venue, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Under Seal Doc., #15 Exhibit Ex. 14 - 2017 Cook County Statistical Summary, #16 Exhibit Ex. 15 - September 2018 Federal Court Statistics)(Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company regarding SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company to Remand #43 (Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company to Remand (Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Motion by John H. Scheid for presentment of motion to seal #41 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 2/6/2020 at 08:30 AM. (Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) MOTION by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company to seal (Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) MOTION by Plaintiff Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E. Golding Declaration ISO Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 - VPCA Claim No. 1156 TF Bankr, #3 Exhibit 2 - GSA, #4 Exhibit 3 - AAA, #5 Exhibit 4 - Exclusivity Period Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - Gibbs v. Rees Transfer Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Banks v. Rees Transfer Order, #8 Exhibit 7 - Gibbs v. Haynes Investments Order, #9 Exhibit 8 - Brice v. Rees Transfer Order, #10 Exhibit 9 - Granger v. Great Plains, #11 Exhibit 10 - Gingras v. Victory Park Docket, #12 Exhibit 11 - Penn AG v. Think Finance Order Denying Transfer, #13 Exhibit 12 - CFPB v. Think Finance Order Denying Mot. to Change Venue, #14 Exhibit 13 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 14 - 2017 Cook County Statistical Summary Final, #16 Exhibit 15 - September 2018 Federal Court Statistics)(Scheid, John) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The parties' agreed scheduling motion #37 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to remand is due by 01/22/2019. Defense response and cross-motion to transfer is due by 02/11/2019. Plaintiffs' reply and response is due by 03/04/2019. Defense reply due by 03/18/2019. Yes, the briefs may be 25 pages, but hopefully shorter if possible. The answer deadline is suspended. Motion number #30 is terminated as superseded by #37 . Status hearing of 01/18/2019 is reset to 04/18/2019 at 9:30 AM.Emailed notice (slb, ) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates STATEMENT by GPL SERVICING TRUST II (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates STATEMENT by GPL SERVICING TRUST (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates STATEMENT by GPL SERVICING, LTD. (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates STATEMENT by GPL SERVICING AGENT, LLC (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GPL SERVICING AGENT, LLC, GPL SERVICING TRUST, GPL SERVICING TRUST II, GPL SERVICING, LTD., VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, VPC/TF TRUST I, Victory Park Management, LLC by Kent Jacob Hayden (Hayden, Kent) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants GPL SERVICING AGENT, LLC, GPL SERVICING TRUST, GPL SERVICING TRUST II, GPL SERVICING, LTD., VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, VPC/TF TRUST I, Victory Park Management, LLC by William Timothy Pruitt (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) EXHIBIT by Defendants GPL SERVICING AGENT, LLC, GPL SERVICING TRUST, GPL SERVICING TRUST II, GPL SERVICING, LTD., VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, VPC/TF TRUST I, Victory Park Management, LLC regarding notice of removal, #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court, case number (2018CH14326) filed by GPL SERVICING AGENT, LLC, GPL SERVICING TRUST, GPL SERVICING TRUST II, GPL SERVICING, LTD., VICTORY PARK CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, VPC/TF TRUST I, Victory Park Management, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15308519. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pruitt, William) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GPL Servicing, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Victory Park Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant