This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:43:16 (UTC).

Elkins v. Bradshaw, et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Elkins filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bradshaw. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01035

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberlana Elkins

Defendants

Joe Edward Bradshaw

Geico Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charlotte McDaniel McGehee

16851 Jefferson Highway, Suite 6-B

Baton Rouge, LA 70817

Seth M. Dornier

Attorney at The Dornier Law Firm, LLC

7925 Jefferson Place Blvd., Suite 30B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Dale Cronin

Attorney at Schutte, Terhoeve, Richardson, Eversberg, Cronin, Judice &

501 Louisiana Avenue

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Floyd A Buras, III

Attorney at Law Office of Floyd Buras, LLC

713 Live Oak Street

Metairie, LA 70005

Richard Randall Ray

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 94005

Baton Rouge, LA 70804-9005

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC - EBR, Case Number 666463. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number LAMDC-1866086), filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - GEICO's Answer, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Excerpts, #5 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Cronin, Stephen). Modified on 11/26/2018 to flatten document (SWE). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

2 #1

Memorandum in Support

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Deposition Excerpts

4 #2

Statement of Undisputed Facts

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - GEICO's Answer

4 #4

Exhibit B Medical of Kimberlana Elkins

4 #3

Exhibit A Depo of Kimberlana Elkins

#2

(#2) MOTION to Remand by Kimberlana Elkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(McGehee, Charlotte) (SWE). Modified on 12/11/2018 to extract blank page (SWE). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

1 #5

Attachment Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Kimberlana Elkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit A Depo of Kimberlana Elkins, #4 Exhibit B Medical of Kimberlana Elkins)(McGehee, Charlotte) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

4 #1

Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Geico Casualty Insurance Company. (Cronin, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 10 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 5 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Kimberlana Elkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Exhibit A Depo of Kimberlana Elkins, #4 Exhibit B Medical of Kimberlana Elkins)(McGehee, Charlotte) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Remand filed by Geico Casualty Insurance Company. (Cronin, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Remand by Kimberlana Elkins. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(McGehee, Charlotte) (SWE). Modified on 12/11/2018 to extract blank page (SWE). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC - EBR, Case Number 666463. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number LAMDC-1866086), filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - GEICO's Answer, #4 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Excerpts, #5 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Cronin, Stephen). Modified on 11/26/2018 to flatten document (SWE). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.