This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:24:17 (UTC).

ELIZONDO et al v. BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 ELIZONDO filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa Pupo Lenihan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01480

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA

RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR

YARICK TABORA ROQUE

MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA

NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO

ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE

Defendants

BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC

BARRY L. STIFFLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lerae Kroon

Attorney at Justice at Work

6101 Penn Avenue

Pittsburgh, PA 15206

Kathryn R. Brown

Attorney at Justice at Work

990 Spring Garden Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19123

Andrew C. Thomas

Attorney at Justice at Work

990 Spring Garden Street, Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19123

Defendant Attorney

S. Michael Streib

Attorney at Streib & McClenahan

2901 Grant Building, 330 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. KAREN ENGRO is appointed as mediator. Party KAREN ENGRO added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/19/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) Joint MOTION to Stay of Proceedings, Referral to Mediation, and Appointment of Mediator by BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC, BARRY L. STIFFLER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Streib, S.) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARRY L. STIFFLER. BARRY L. STIFFLER waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Streib, S.) Modified text on 11/26/2018. (cel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC. BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Streib, S.) Modified text on 11/26/2018. (cel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn R. Brown on behalf of NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO, RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR, MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA, MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA, ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE, YARICK TABORA ROQUE. (Brown, Kathryn ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Thomas on behalf of NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO, RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR, MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA, MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA, ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE, YARICK TABORA ROQUE. (Thomas, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/06/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC, BARRY L. STIFFLER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4921438) filed by MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA, MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA, ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE, NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO, RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR, YARICK TABORA ROQUE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. KAREN ENGRO is appointed as mediator. Party KAREN ENGRO added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/19/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING the #7 Joint Motion for Stay of Proceedings, Referral to Mediation and Appointment of Mediator. The proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending the outcome of mediation. The Court will appoint Karen Engro as the Mediator. Counsel for the parties shall contact the mediator, schedule the mediation, and advise the Court as to the date or dates selected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 12/19/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION to Stay of Proceedings, Referral to Mediation, and Appointment of Mediator by BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC, BARRY L. STIFFLER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Streib, S.) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC on 1/14/2019; BARRY L. STIFFLER on 1/14/2019 (cel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARRY L. STIFFLER. BARRY L. STIFFLER waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Streib, S.) Modified text on 11/26/2018. (cel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC. BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Streib, S.) Modified text on 11/26/2018. (cel) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn R. Brown on behalf of NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO, RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR, MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA, MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA, ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE, YARICK TABORA ROQUE. (Brown, Kathryn ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew C. Thomas on behalf of NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO, RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR, MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA, MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA, ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE, YARICK TABORA ROQUE. (Thomas, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/06/2018. (jmb) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BARRY'S GROUND COVER, LLC, BARRY L. STIFFLER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4921438) filed by MANUEL DE JESUS ANTONI ORELLANA, MELVIN OVIDIO DE PAZ MOJICA, ALAN DAVID TABORA ROQUE, NOE ALBERTO ELIAS ELIZONDO, RAMIRO ANTONIO CALDERO MELGAR, YARICK TABORA ROQUE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less