This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2019 at 07:30:38 (UTC).

Elgin v. Wilson et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Elgin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wilson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00915

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Koka N Elgin

Defendants

Shawn Stephens

Sissie Wilson

Glenda Rose

John Does

Steve Jeffery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luther Oneal Sutter

Attorney at Sutter & Gillham, PLLC

Post Office Box 2012

Benton, AR 72018

Defendant Attorney

Jason E. Owens

Attorney at Jason Owens Law Firm, PA

Regions Bank Building, 1023 Main Street, Suite 203

Conway, AR 72032

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , by Steve Jeffery, Shawn Stephens, Sissie Wilson.(Owens, Jason) Docket text modified on 12/27/2018 to remove duplicate text. (kbc) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED DEFIENCEY SIGNATURE ONLY with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Koka N Elgin(Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Koka N Elgin. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069991. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Sissie Wilson served on 12/14/2018. (Sutter, Luther) Docket text modified on 12/28/2018 to correct service date. (kbc) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Shawn Stephens served on 12/12/2018. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the date of service) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Owens on behalf of Steve Jeffery, Shawn Stephens, Sissie Wilson (Owens, Jason) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#3

(#3) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned by Koka N Elgin as to Steve Jeffery. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 1/3/2019 to correct the description of the document filed.)(cmn) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#2

(#2) JOHN DOE AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff's Counsel by Koka N Elgin. (kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Steve Jeffery served on 12/12/2018. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the date of service) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#13

(#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/22/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/2/2019 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/2/19. (lp) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Sissie Wilson served on 12/12/2018. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the date of service) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as: "SUMMONS Returned by Koka N Elgin as to Steve Jeffery." (cmn) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/8/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 3/22/2019. Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 12/2/2019 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/2/19. (lp) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #12 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the service date to 12/14/2018, as indicated on the document. (kbc) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Sissie Wilson served on 12/14/2018. (Sutter, Luther) Docket text modified on 12/28/2018 to correct service date. (kbc) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned by Koka N Elgin as to Steve Jeffery. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 1/3/2019 to correct the description of the document filed.)(cmn) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION #10 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (kbc) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , by Steve Jeffery, Shawn Stephens, Sissie Wilson.(Owens, Jason) Docket text modified on 12/27/2018 to remove duplicate text. (kbc) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E. Owens on behalf of Steve Jeffery, Shawn Stephens, Sissie Wilson (Owens, Jason) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 , #6 and #7 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket texts were modified to correct the date of service as 12/12/2018 as marked on the documents. (jak) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. (Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Steve Jeffery served on 12/12/2018. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the date of service) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Shawn Stephens served on 12/12/2018. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the date of service) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Koka N Elgin. Sissie Wilson served on 12/12/2018. (Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 12/14/2018 to correct the date of service) (jak) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED DEFIENCEY SIGNATURE ONLY with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Koka N Elgin(Sutter, Luther) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P.11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) JOHN DOE AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff's Counsel by Koka N Elgin. (kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Koka N Elgin. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069991. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.