This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2019 at 19:18:33 (UTC).

El Dorado Ammonia, L.L.C. et al v. Benham Constructors, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 El Dorado Ammonia, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Benham Constructors, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01006

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

El Dorado Ammonia, L.L.C.

El Dorado Chemical Company

Defendants

Benham Constructors, L.L.C.

Leidos, Inc.

Leidos Engineering, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Floyd Mattison Thomas, III

Attorney at F. Mattison Thomas, III

103 East Main, Suite D

El Dorado, AR 71730

Katie Tipper-McWhorter

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Ste. 1700

Houston, TX 77002

James R. Leahy

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Kellie Marie Humphries

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley Stewart PA

225 Water Street, Suite 1750

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Julia Michelle Holden-Davis

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley Stewart P.A.

225 Water Street, Suite 1750

Jacksonville, FL 32202

David M. Wells

Attorney at Gunster Yoakley Stewart P.A.

225 Water Street, Suite 1750

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Jessica P. Koehler

Attorney at Wright Lindsey Jennings LLP

200 W Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Patrick Darrow Wilson

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings LLP

200 W. Capitol Ave., Suite 2300, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201

John F. Peiserich

Attorney at Perkins & Trotter, P.L.L.C.

One Information Way, P.O. Box 251618

Little Rock, AR 72225-1618

Molly Shepherd

100 E. Church

El Dorado, AR 71730

Stephen A. Klein

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street N.W., 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005

William J. Cople, III

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1653539.. (Peiserich, John) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

1 #1

Ex. A - State Court Docs

1 #2

Ex. B - Notice of Removal

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Leidos, Inc. (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Benham Constructors, L.L.C., Leidos Engineering, LLC., Leidos, Inc. filed by El Dorado Ammonia, L.L.C., El Dorado Chemical Company. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leidos, Inc.. (Peiserich, John) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

#6

(#7) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint /Defendant Benham Constructors, LLC's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Wilson, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint /Defendant Benham Constructors, LLC's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Wilson, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

#103

(#103) MOTION to Dismiss Case by El Dorado Chemical Company. (Thomas, III, Floyd) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#104

(#104) ORDER granting #103 Motion to Dismiss Case (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 31, 2018. (cnn) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#102

(#102) REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count D of the First Amended Complaint filed by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#79

(#102) REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count D of the First Amended Complaint filed by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

101 #1

Exhibit A

#77

(#101) REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent filed by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#101

(#101) REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent filed by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

77 #2

Exhibit B

77 #1

Exhibit A

159 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) ORDER granting #103 Motion to Dismiss Case (CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE). Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 31, 2018. (cnn) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) MOTION to Dismiss Case by El Dorado Chemical Company. (Thomas, III, Floyd) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Count D of the First Amended Complaint filed by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to Comply with Conditions Precedent filed by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Koehler, Jessica) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #100 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Patrick William Stark is directed to immediately register as a CM/ECF user if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by the Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 7, 2018. (jpb) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) MOTION for Attorney Patrick William Stark to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number 0861-1755015) by El Dorado Ammonia, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Thomas, III, Floyd) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Leidos Engineering, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klein, Stephen) Modified on 8/6/2018 to delete duplicate text (cnn). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Leidos, Inc.. (Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to file replies by Leidos until 8/3/18. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 24, 2018. (cnn) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to file reply until 8/7/18. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 24, 2018. (cnn) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Failure to Comply with Mandatory Conditions Precedent by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Wilson, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint /Defendant Benham Constructors, LLC's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Wilson, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Case /Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by Benham Constructors, L.L.C.. (Wilson, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Leidos, Inc.. (Peiserich, John) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1653539.. (Peiserich, John) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/22/2018. (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Benham Constructors, L.L.C., Leidos Engineering, LLC., Leidos, Inc. filed by El Dorado Ammonia, L.L.C., El Dorado Chemical Company. (Originally filed in state court.) (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Leidos, Inc. (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Union County, Arkansas, case number 17-473-6. filed by Leidos, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Docs, #2 Ex. B - Notice of Removal) (mll) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.