This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:53:53 (UTC).

Edwards-Rector et al v. Hospira Worldwide, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Edwards-Rector filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Hospira Worldwide, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Triche Milazzo and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-08128

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Triche Milazzo

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Rector

Tiana Louise Edwards-Rector

Defendants

Hospira, Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc.

Hospira Worldwide, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Ryan McCarley

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 715

Dallas, TX 75206

Charlotte A Gulewicz

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

4925 Greenville Avenue, Suite 715

Dallas, TX 75206

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC. (aj) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #2

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7081327) filed by Tiana Louise Edwards-Rector, David Rector. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Tiana Louise Edwards-Rector(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party David Rector(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#4

(#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Hospira Worldwide, LLC. (aj) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7081327) filed by Tiana Louise Edwards-Rector, David Rector. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party Tiana Louise Edwards-Rector(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley added to party David Rector(pty:pla).(McCarley, Matthew) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.